Syswerda v. Mnuchin et al
Plaintiff: David Henry Syswerda
Defendant: John Koskinen, Internal Revenue Service, Charles P. Rettig, David J. Kautter, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Steven Mnuchin and United States Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 1:2020cv00471
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Internal Revenue Service, David J. Kautter, John Koskinen, Steven Mnuchin, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to plaintiff via mail (ems) Modified text on 6/26/2020 (ems).
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, David J. Kautter, John Koskinen, Steven Mnuchin, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury, Unknown Part(y)(ies) filed by David Henry Syswerda (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2 - Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ems)
June 5, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion to Serve the Complaint #5 sent via U.S. Mail to David Henry Syswerda (ems)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 motion to serve the complaint; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
June 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to serve the complaint (in letter form) #3 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from plaintiff David Henry Syswerda regarding summons and Motion #3 (ems)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to serve the complaint (in letter form) by plaintiff David Henry Syswerda; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Proposed Summons) (ems)
May 29, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Internal Revenue Service, David J. Kautter, John Koskinen, Steven Mnuchin, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury (no proposed summons provided; please refer to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) regarding service on the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees)(docket sheet and (1) blank summons form mailed to plaintiff 5/29/20) (ems)
May 29, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to David Henry Syswerda (ems)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
May 28, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR070943; for civil filing fee (ems)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, David J. Kautter, John Koskinen, Steven Mnuchin, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury, Unknown Part(y)(ies) filed by David Henry Syswerda (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syswerda v. Mnuchin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Koskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles P. Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Kautter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Henry Syswerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?