Garcia v. Warden
Petitioner: Marco A. Garcia #12946-040
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2020cv00476
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Connecticut, their case number 3:20-cv-00728; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of transfer - Mr. Garcia is currently serving a term of imprisonment at FCI Danbury following his conviction in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan. United States v. Garcia, No. 1:94-cr-00190-PLM-6. Although docketed as a petition for a writ of habeas corpus, the Court construes the letter received from Mr. Garcia as a motion for sentence reduction or compassionate release under the First Step Act, 18 U.S.C. 3582(c)(1)(A). Further, the Court understands that the same motion has been submitted, albeit in a different form, in his criminal matter, which is currently assigned to Judge Paul L. Maloney in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan. Because Mr. Garcia's motion must be taken up by the court presiding over his criminal matter, the Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this matter to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/28/2020.(Gould, K.)[Transferred from Connecticut on 5/29/2020.] Modified text on 5/29/2020 (ndj).
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency. You must submit the $5.00 filing fee or the attached IFP aplication which is being sent to you via U.S. mail along with a ledger sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 6/18/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 5/28/20.(Payton, R.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing protective order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 05/26/2020.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/29/2020.] Modified text on 5/29/2020 (ndj).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic filing order for counsel - please ensure compliance with courtesy copy requirements in this order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 05/26/2020.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/29/2020.] Modified text on 5/29/2020 (ndj).
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Marco A. Garcia.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/29/2020.] Modified text on 5/29/2020 (ndj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco A. Garcia #12946-040
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?