Harris #292201 v. Nader et al
Plaintiff: Willie J. Harris
Defendant: Ziker and Kari Nader
Case Number: 1:2020cv00550
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11368; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/16/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Willie J. Harris. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/16/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Willie J. Harris against Kari Nader, Ziker (Attachments: #1 Coversheet) (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris #292201 v. Nader et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ziker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?