Miller v. Cintas Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gordon Miller
Defendant: Franklin Kuespert, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Cintas Service Transportation, LLC, Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. and Cintas Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00577
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 9/3/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE on Status of Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut by plaintiff Gordon Miller (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Conybeare, Barry)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: joint notice regarding Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut due no later than 8/17/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Cintas Corporation, Cintas Service Transportation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cintas Corporation for Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Cintas Corporation, Cintas Service Transportation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Callahan, Robert)
June 30, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathaniel Edward Harrington on behalf of plaintiff Gordon Miller (Harrington, Nathaniel)
June 30, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Barry R. Conybeare on behalf of plaintiff Gordon Miller (Conybeare, Barry)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ndj)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Cintas Corporation, Cintas Service Transportation, LLC, Franklin Kuespert re Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal) #2 (Callahan, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Cintas Corporation, Cintas Service Transportation, LLC, Franklin Kuespert (Callahan, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berrien County Circuit Court case number 2020-0073-NI-W filed by Cintas Corporate Services,Inc., Cintas Service Transportation, LLC, Cintas Corporation, Franklin Kuespert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Callahan, Robert) Modified text on 6/25/2020 (jlg)
June 25, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Cintas Corporation, Cintas Service Transportation, LLC, Franklin Kuespert in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5392532 (Callahan, Robert) Modified text on 6/25/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Cintas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Kuespert
Represented By: Robert A. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Service Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporation
Represented By: Robert A. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Miller
Represented By: Barry R. Conybeare
Represented By: Nathaniel Edward Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?