Nerowski v. Essendant Co.
Plaintiff: John Nerowski
Defendant: ORS Nasco, LLC and Essendant Co.
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2020cv00589
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thomas R. Behm ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 9/3/2020 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 9/3/2020 (lep)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 SELECTION of Thomas Behm as facilitative mediator by plaintiff John Nerowski (Kowalko, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 2/11/2021; dispositive motions due by 3/11/2021; settlement conference set for 11/17/2021 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 12/13/2021 at 09:30 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 1/4/2022 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; case management order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (jal)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Kowalko, Michael)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/10/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; the call-in information information remains the same; status report due by 8/5/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Conference call information for 8/11/2020 hearing [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Essendant Co., John Nerowski only] (jal)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/11/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; status report due by 8/6/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Essendant Co. identifying Corporate Parent Essendant Inc. for Essendant Co. (Densham, Sandra)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Essendant Co. (Densham, Sandra)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT FILE received (partial) Register of Actions from Kent County Circuit Court. (mg)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving STIPULATION for substitution of defendant #3 ; deadline for defendant to respond to complaint is extended to 7/10/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Substitute Essendant Co. as the sole Defendant and to dismiss ORS Nasco, LLC/Essendant Industrial LLC by defendant ORS Nasco, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Densham, Sandra)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ORS Nasco, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bution Holdco 2 for ORS Nasco, LLC (Densham, Sandra)
June 30, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant ORS Nasco, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5409232 (Densham, Sandra)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 20-03318-NO filed by ORS Nasco, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Amendment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Verdict Search, #4 Exhibit 4 - Verdict Search, #5 Exhibit 5 - Verdict Search, #6 Exhibit 6 - Verdict Search, #7 Exhibit 7 - Verdict Search, #8 Exhibit 8 - Verdict Search, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Densham, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nerowski v. Essendant Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nerowski
Represented By: Michael A. Kowalko
Represented By: Thomas William Waun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORS Nasco, LLC
Represented By: Sandra J. Densham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essendant Co.
Represented By: Sandra J. Densham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Thomas R. Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?