Calhoun #379175 v. Burt
Petitioner: Samuel E. Calhoun #379175 and Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175
Respondent: Heidi Washington and S. L. Burt
Case Number: 1:2020cv00591
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion to Supplement, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel E. Calhoun #379175 (ems)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #9 #10 and #11 motion for relief and supplemental pleadings; denying as moot #12 motion to appoint counsel; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to appoint counsel by petitioner Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175; (ems)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for order for the court to construe petitioner's pleading by petitioner Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ems)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to supplement #9 by petitioner Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175; (mg)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for new trial by petitioner Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ems)
July 15, 2020 Certified Copies of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #7 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #8 , Opinion (Screening) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel E. Calhoun #379175 (ems)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION; Order and Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from petitioner Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 regarding status of case; Response from Clerk, docket sheet, and courtesy copy of #2 mailed to plaintiff 7/10/20 (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk) (ems)
July 2, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems) Modified text on 7/2/2020 (ems).
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11548; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
June 26, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Samuel E. Calhoun Pris. No. 379175, MUSKEGON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 2400 S. SHERIDAN, MUSKEGON, MI 49442 (LBar) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Samuel E. Calhoun against Heidi Washington. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Cover Sheet) (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun #379175 v. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. L. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel E. Calhoun #379175
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?