Phillips-Addis #420015 v. Bottrell et al
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015
Defendant: Noah Bottrell, Les Parish, Unknown Ward, Unknown Best, Ken MacEachern and D. Weller
Case Number: 1:2020cv00620
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 requesting docket sheet as taken from #46 ; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc) Modified text on 9/4/2020 (mlc).
September 3, 2020 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for order to correct a mistake (submitted as a letter) #19 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit 1) (mlc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to appoint counsel #42 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (mlc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 45 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for order named as, "motion of violations of rights" #43 named as, "motion for factual violations of constitution" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (mlc)
August 31, 2020 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 requesting docket sheet as taken from #44 ; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (mlc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 re MOTION to appoint counsel #42 , MOTION for order named as, "motion of violations of rights" #43 (mlc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for order named as, "motion of violations of rights" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (mlc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 41 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 requesting docket sheet and copies; (no additional check was enclosed) mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk Memo) (mlc) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (mlc).
August 28, 2020 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for order for personal protection #11 named as, "motion of request this court set a judgment order for protection" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for order to correct a mistake (submitted as a letter) #19 named as, "motion corrected all errors of filing" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for order to correct a mistake (submitted as a letter) #19 named as, "motions of corrections and errors" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
August 26, 2020 NOTE: $122.00 from receipt numbers GR071698, GR071699, GR071700 and GR071701, dated 8/20/2020 was transferred from this case to case number 1:20-CV-686 ; total paid to date in this case is $400.00 (Financial Administrator, ced)
August 24, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER from Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding copies (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Response from Clerk) (ns)
August 24, 2020 Filing 35 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ns)
August 20, 2020 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 named as, "additional motion tried to address all areas of resolve before filing this case" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Prisoner Institutional / Trust Fund Account Activity) (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding copies of all motions filed (mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 MDOC legal mail form, #2 Response from Clerk Memo) (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to amend/correct #1 to add additional defendants #20 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for order named as, "motion of requesting an order of as a subpoena "Duce Tecum" upon defendants Washington and Maceacheru" #27 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for order named as, "motion of requesting an order of as a subpoena "Duce Tecum" upon defendant J. Spencley" #26 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for order named as, "motion of requesting an order of as a subpoena "Duce Tecum" upon defendants Bottrell and Ward" #25 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for order named as, "motion of requesting an order of as a subpoena "Duce Tecum" upon defendants Washington and Maceacheru" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for order named as, "motion of requesting an order of as a subpoena "Duce Tecum" upon defendant J. Spencley" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for order named as, "motion of requesting an order of as a subpoena "Duce Tecum" upon defendants Bottrell and Ward" by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding motion #20 and payment sent to the court for $47.00 (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 BRIEF in support of MOTION to amend/correct #1 to add additional defendants #20 filed by Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Administrative Staff) (mlc)
August 20, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $25.00, receipt number GR071701; amount paid to date $522.00 (mkc)
August 20, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $25.00, receipt number GR071700; amount paid to date $497.00 (mkc)
August 20, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $25.00, receipt number GR071699; amount paid to date $472.00 (mkc)
August 20, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $47.00, receipt number GR071698; amount paid to date $447.00 (mkc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding Request Notices ASAP and being in danger (mlc) Modified date filed on 8/21/2020 (jmw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 (affidavit regarding additional harassment) by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (slk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE regarding issues with his case and payments he is submitting by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (slk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to amend/correct #1 to add additional defendants by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (slk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for order to correct a mistake (submitted as a letter) by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
August 17, 2020 NOTE: $53.00 from receipt number GR071626, dated 8/11/20 was transferred from this case to case number 1:20-CV-686 ; total paid to date in this case is $400.00 (Financial Administrator, ced)
August 14, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 re Notice (Other) #17 , MOTION for order #16 (ns)
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE regarding witnesses by plaintiff Phillips-Addis #420015 (ns)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for order by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER from Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding copies (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk) (ns)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER from plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 regarding filing fees and requesting docket sheet; docket sheet mailed on 8/12/2020 (ns) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (ns).
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 re Supplement #10 , MOTION for order for personal protection #11 , Brief in Support of a Motion #12 (ns)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in support of MOTION for order for personal protection #11 filed by Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ns)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for order for personal protection by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ns)
August 11, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $53.00, receipt number GR071626; amount paid to date $453.00 (mkc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15) (ns)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #7 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
August 4, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $353.00, receipt number GR071550; amount paid to date $400.00 (mkc) Modified text on 8/7/2020 (ns).
July 27, 2020 (DISREGARD) RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $47.00, receipt number GR071479; amount paid to date $94.00 (mkc) Modified text on 8/7/2020; entered in wrong case (ns).
July 24, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ns)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/20/2020 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Phillips-Addis #420015 re #1 (ns)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ns)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 re Receipt (Prisoner Litigation - Subsequent Payment), Affidavit #2 , Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 (ns)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 by plaintiff Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (ns)
July 9, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $47.00, receipt number LN002756; amount paid to date $47.00 (ns)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Unknown Best, Noah Bottrell, Les Parish, Unknown Ward filed by Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips-Addis #420015 v. Bottrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Phillips-Addis #420015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Bottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken MacEachern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?