Burton et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jennie Burton
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00646
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Northern District of California, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 3:20-cv-05529 (ems)
August 6, 2020 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of California (ems)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of California; case transferred to Northern District of California under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (ems)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of California regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (ems)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Monsanto Company (ems)
July 17, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Jennie Burton, Jennie Burton in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5473407 (Hanna, Michael)
July 17, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Monsanto Company (filing fee not paid) (ems)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ems)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Berens indicating that this case is related to 1:20-cv-333, 1:20-cv-445, 1:20-cv-446 and 1:20-cv-447 (mkc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company filed by Jennie Burton (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Hanna, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Burton
Represented By: Michael N. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?