Williams v. Adducci et al
Petitioner: Frederick Vernon Williams
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Derek N. Brenner, Rebecca Adducci and Timothy S. Robbins
Case Number: 1:2020cv00659
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number GR071724 (mkc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 , #2 to the Court by petitioner Frederick Vernon Williams (ems)
July 23, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Frederick Vernon Williams #A205-405-848 (clw)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/19/2020 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Frederick Vernon Williams (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Adducci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derek N. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rebecca Adducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy S. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick Vernon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?