Simpson v. Fluresh, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Simpson
Defendant: Fluresh, LLC and Sabina Lone
Case Number: 1:2020cv00695
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Fluresh, LLC, Sabina Lone (ns)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 ; Plaintiff to file amended application within seven days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Re: In Forma Pauperis Granted by plaintiff Jacob Simpson (Alvarez, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Alvarez, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Fluresh, LLC, Sabina Lone filed by Jacob Simpson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alvarez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Fluresh, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluresh, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabina Lone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Simpson
Represented By: Robert Anthony Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?