Fey v. TCF Financial Corporation
Plaintiff: Tasha Fey
Defendant: TCF Financial Corporation doing business as Chemical Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv00702
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended by TCF Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent TCF Financial Corporation for TCF Financial Corporation (Giffen, Jaclyn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 10/15/20; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/14/2020 at 11:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 10/8/2020 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TCF Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent TCF Financial Corporation for TCF Financial Corporation (Giffen, Jaclyn)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by TCF Financial Corporation (Giffen, Jaclyn)
August 25, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Anton A. Dirnberger, II on behalf of defendant TCF Financial Corporation (Dirnberger, Anton)
August 25, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jaclyn Rose Therese Giffen on behalf of defendant TCF Financial Corporation (Giffen, Jaclyn)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant TCF Financial Corporation (mg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mg)
July 31, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Carrie E. Trimpe on behalf of plaintiff Tasha Fey (Trimpe, Carrie)
July 30, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Tasha Fey in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5518338 (Wilkinson, Mark)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against TCF Financial Corporation filed by Tasha Fey (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilkinson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fey v. TCF Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF Financial Corporation doing business as Chemical Bank
Represented By: Jaclyn Rose Therese Giffen
Represented By: Anton A. Dirnberger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Fey
Represented By: Mark S. Wilkinson
Represented By: Carrie E. Trimpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?