Salgado-Rios v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: G FS and Yolanda Salgado-Rios
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Daniel Renaud, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00705
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss #10 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of dismissal under Fed R. Civ. P. 41(a) by defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Daniel Renaud, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F. Wolf (Weintraub, J.)
September 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of J. Max Weintraub on behalf of defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Daniel Renaud, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F. Wolf (Weintraub, J.)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/10/2020 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/3/2020; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Yolanda Salgado-Rios re JOINT MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff GFS #6 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #7 (Asch, Marc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff GFS #6 filed by Yolanda Salgado-Rios (Asch, Marc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff GFS by plaintiff Yolanda Salgado-Rios; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Asch, Marc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed on All Defendants, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit regarding service) (Asch, Marc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Daniel Renaud, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ns)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Asch, Marc)
July 30, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Yolanda Salgado-Rios in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5520151 (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 7/31/2020 (jlg)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Yolanda Salgado-Rios (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 7/31/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salgado-Rios v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Renaud
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G FS
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Salgado-Rios
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?