Rice Lake Farms, Inc. v. A & J Produce Corp et al
Plaintiff: Rice Lake Farms, Inc.
Defendant: A & J Produce Corp, Thomas J Tramutola and Thomas J. Tramutola
Case Number: 1:2020cv00757
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; Judge Janet T. Neff is no longer assigned to the case (asm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Thomas J. Tramutola served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020 (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; A & J Produce Corp served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020 (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants A & J Produce Corp, Thomas J. Tramutola (ndj)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ndj)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rice Lake Farms, Inc. (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
August 13, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Rice Lake Farms, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5571027 (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A & J Produce Corp, Thomas J. Tramutola filed by Rice Lake Farms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Pirrotta, Salvatore) Modified text on 8/14/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice Lake Farms, Inc. v. A & J Produce Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & J Produce Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Tramutola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Tramutola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rice Lake Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Salvatore W. Pirrotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?