Blocker v. State of Michigan et al
Plaintiff: Corey Blocker
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer and State of Michigan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00772
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #21 , Order Rejecting Pleading #22 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (jlg)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REJECTING Motion to subpoena submitted by Corey Blocker ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REJECTING Statement of Fact submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
October 8, 2020 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #20 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (ndj) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (ndj).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REJECTING Motion to subpoena submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
October 6, 2020 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #17 with original document sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (jlg)
October 6, 2020 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #18 with original documents, Order Rejecting Pleading #19 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (tlbu)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REJECTING Motion for fraud upon the court submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REJECTING Motion to collateral attack this case submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REJECTING Statement of Fact submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
October 1, 2020 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #16 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (tlbu)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REJECTING Statement of Fact submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
September 25, 2020 Certified Copy of Judgment #15 , Order Regarding Report and Recommendation, #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (mg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff; this case is dismissed ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 ; Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim and lack of subject matter jurisdiction; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for appeal ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for order for subpoena by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (mg)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE titled as "Statement of fact" by plaintiff Corey Blocker (mg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE titled as "Statement of fact" by plaintiff Corey Blocker (mg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE titled as "Statement of fact and exhibit D" by plaintiff Corey Blocker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D) (mg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE titled as "Statement of fact and exhibit C" by plaintiff Corey Blocker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C) (mg) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (mg).
August 28, 2020 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (ems)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green nunc pro tunc as of 8/21/2020 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 26, 2020 Copy of Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (mg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 24, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (clw)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 21, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (mg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF CASE by plaintiff Corey Blocker (mg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is related to 1:20-cv-444 (mg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against State of Michigan, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Corey Blocker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blocker v. State of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?