Radspieler v. Otsego, City of et al
Plaintiff: Albert Radspieler
Defendant: Brandon Weber, Gordon Konkle, City of Otsego Police Department, Otsego, City of and Otsego Police Department, City of
Case Number: 1:2020cv00777
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to complaint #1 with reliance on jury demand, affirmative defenses, and certificate of service by Gordon Konkle, Otsego Police Department, City of, Otsego, City of, Brandon Weber (Morris, G.) Modified text on 10/15/2020 (jem).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting STIPULATION #14 dismissing count II of Plaintiff's Complaint ; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
October 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Marie Zdarsky on behalf of defendant Gordon Konkle (Zdarsky, Amanda)
October 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Craig R. Noland on behalf of defendant Gordon Konkle (Noland, Craig)
October 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher James Raiti on behalf of defendant Gordon Konkle (Raiti, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of G. Gus Morris on behalf of defendant Gordon Konkle (Morris, G.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by defendants Gordon Konkle, Otsego Police Department, City of, Otsego, City of, Brandon Weber (Morris, G.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; Gordon Konkle served on 9/9/2020, answer due 10/15/2020 (Levi, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; Brandon Weber served on 9/9/2020, answer due 10/15/2020 (Levi, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; Otsego, City of served on 9/9/2020, answer due 10/15/2020 (Levi, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Otsego Police Department, City of served on 9/9/2020, answer due 10/15/2020 (Levi, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071; District Judge Paul L. Maloney is no longer assigned to the case (jem)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to respond to complaint is extended to 10/15/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants Gordon Konkle, Otsego Police Department, City of, Otsego, City of, Brandon Weber [Attorney G. Gus Morris added to party Gordon Konkle(pty:dft)] (Morris, G.)
August 27, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Marie Zdarsky on behalf of defendants Otsego Police Department, City of, Otsego, City of, Brandon Weber (Zdarsky, Amanda)
August 27, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Craig R. Noland on behalf of defendants Otsego Police Department, City of, Otsego, City of, Brandon Weber (Noland, Craig)
August 27, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher James Raiti on behalf of defendants Otsego Police Department, City of, Otsego, City of, Brandon Weber (Raiti, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of G. Gus Morris on behalf of defendants Otsego Police Department, City of, Otsego, City of, Brandon Weber (Morris, G.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Gordon Konkle, Otsego Police Department, City of, Otsego, City of, Brandon Weber (ndj)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Albert Radspieler (Levi, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Lawrence Levi counsel for plaintiff Albert Radspieler (Levi, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Levi, Robert)
August 20, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to plaintiff Albert Radspieler none provided (ndj)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ndj)
August 18, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Albert Radspieler in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5586098 (Levi, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Albert Radspieler (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Levi, Robert) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (ndj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radspieler v. Otsego, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Weber
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Craig R. Noland
Represented By: Amanda Marie Zdarsky
Represented By: Christopher James Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Konkle
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Craig R. Noland
Represented By: Amanda Marie Zdarsky
Represented By: Christopher James Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Otsego Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsego, City of
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Craig R. Noland
Represented By: Amanda Marie Zdarsky
Represented By: Christopher James Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsego Police Department, City of
Represented By: G. Gus Morris
Represented By: Craig R. Noland
Represented By: Amanda Marie Zdarsky
Represented By: Christopher James Raiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Radspieler
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?