Wang v. 2501 Abbot L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Angela Wang
Defendant: Campus Advantage, Inc. and 2501 Abbot L.L.C.
Petitioner: East Lansing Police Department
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2020cv00780
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Copy of Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator #17 sent via email to Kara Tertzag Lividini (lep)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Kara Tertzag Lividini ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 10/9/2020 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 10/9/2020 (lep)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Selected Mediator by plaintiff Angela Wang (Dragovic, Andrija)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: not recorded) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT (instructions for 9/22/2020 telephonic scheduling conference) by the Court [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for 2501 Abbot L.L.C., Campus Advantage, Inc., Angela Wang only] (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE rescheduling hearing: Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Janet T. Neff converted to a telephonic conference; counsel shall not appear in person; (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Angela Wang Rule 16 (Dragovic, Andrija)
September 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrija Dragovic on behalf of plaintiff Angela Wang (Dragovic, Andrija)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding motion to quash and request for protective order #9 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to quash Subpoena by movant East Lansing Police Department; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Housefield, Erin) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (ns).
September 3, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Erin Elizabeth Housefield on behalf of movant East Lansing Police Department ; party East Lansing Police Department added limited purpose of motion to quash (Housefield, Erin)
August 27, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark J. Zausmer on behalf of defendants 2501 Abbot L.L.C., Campus Advantage, Inc. (Zausmer, Mark)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 9/15/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Demand for Jury Trial by 2501 Abbot L.L.C., Campus Advantage, Inc. (Wawrzyniak, Lauren)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER striking answer #5 ; Defendants shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Demand for Jury Trial by 2501 Abbot L.L.C., Campus Advantage, Inc. (Wawrzyniak, Lauren) Modified text on 8/26/2020 per Order #6 (ns).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Campus Advantage, Inc. (Wawrzyniak, Lauren)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 2501 Abbot L.L.C. (Wawrzyniak, Lauren)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
August 18, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney Lauren M. Wawrzyniak on behalf of defendants, receipt number AMIWDC- 5586547; for filing fee (mkc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ingham County Circuit Court case number 20-374-NO filed by Campus Advantage Inc, 2501 Abbot LLC (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex C - Proofs of Service, #5 Exhibit Ex D - Correspondence to Plaintiff) (Wawrzyniak, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. 2501 Abbot L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Wang
Represented By: Andrija Dragovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campus Advantage, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Represented By: Mark J. Zausmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2501 Abbot L.L.C.
Represented By: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Represented By: Mark J. Zausmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: East Lansing Police Department
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Housefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Kara Tertzag Lividini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?