Mrozik v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Courtney N Mrozik
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00782
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020 (mg)
August 25, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (clw)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (mg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Spencer, Karen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Courtney N Mrozik (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court Summons, #3 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court Fee Agreement) (Spencer, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mrozik v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney N Mrozik
Represented By: Karen M. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?