Van Ittersum et al v. Lederman et al
Plaintiff: Daisy Benavidez-Van Ittersum and Jared M. Van Ittersum
Defendant: Janet Lederman and Neil Lederman
Case Number: 1:2020cv00804
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 20 SELECTION of Lee T. Silver as facilitative mediator by plaintiffs Daisy Benavidez-Van Ittersum, Jared M. Van Ittersum (Boncher, Frederick)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 4/16/2021; dispositive motions due by 5/14/2021; settlement conference set for 10/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 11/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; bench trial set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; case management order to issue (Proceedings Not Digitally Recorded) (sjc) Modified on 10/19/2020 (sjc).
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 10/16/2020 at 11:00 A.M. before District Judge Jarbou; telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 10/16/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Amon, Thomas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Reply to Response to Motion #14 filed by Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman (Amon, Thomas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to response to motion #5 to Dismiss filed by Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman (Amon, Thomas)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #9 with affirmative defenses by Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman (Amon, Thomas)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker is no longer assigned to the case (krv)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF by plaintiffs Daisy Benavidez-Van Ittersum, Jared M. Van Ittersum re #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Boncher, Frederick) Modified text on 9/23/2020 (ems).
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #5 filed by Daisy Benavidez-Van Ittersum, Jared M. Van Ittersum (Boncher, Frederick)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jared M. Van Ittersum, Daisy Benavidez-Van Ittersum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Boncher, Frederick) Modified text on 9/21/2020 (ems).
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT FILE received from State of Michigan 20th Judicial Court for the County of Ottawa (Attachments: #1 Certified Register of Actions, #2 Complaint, #3 Complaint Continued, #4 Complaint Continued, #5 Complaint Continued, #6 Summons, #7 Proof of Service, #8 Appearance, #9 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (mlc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #6 filed by Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman (Amon, Thomas)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #5 filed by Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman (Amon, Thomas)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman; (Amon, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/16/2020 at 11:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 10/9/2020 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 25, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5612654 (Amon, Thomas)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (clw)
August 24, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul Donald Bratt on behalf of defendants Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman (Bratt, Paul)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman re Notice of Removal #1 (Amon, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ottawa County Circuit Court case number 20-6210-CK filed by Janet Lederman, Neil Lederman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Amon, Thomas) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Ittersum et al v. Lederman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Benavidez-Van Ittersum
Represented By: Frederick J. Boncher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared M. Van Ittersum
Represented By: Frederick J. Boncher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Lederman
Represented By: Thomas M. Amon
Represented By: Paul Donald Bratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Lederman
Represented By: Thomas M. Amon
Represented By: Paul Donald Bratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?