DeMeulenaere v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisa DeMeulenaere
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00823
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 (pjw)
September 23, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Lisa DeMeulenaere (kw)
September 23, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (kw)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 SIGNATURE PAGE submitted by plaintiff Lisa DeMeulenaere for complaint #1 (ns)
September 1, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Lisa DeMeulenae (tlbu)
September 1, 2020 Copy of Conditional Order Striking Pleading #3 and blank signature page sent via U.S. Mail to Lisa DeMeulenaere (tlbu)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONDITIONAL ORDER striking complaint #1 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
August 31, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security none provided and application to proceed ifp not received at time of filing (pjw) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (pjw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 UNSIGNED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Lisa DeMeulenaere (pjw) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (pjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMeulenaere v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa DeMeulenaere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?