Funkl et al v. Lone Star Resort LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andreas Funkl, Gerd Funkl and Maria Angerer
Defendant: Unkle Family Trust, Charles Unkle, Lone Star Resort LLC, Carol Unkle, Todd Unkle and Troy Unkle
Case Number: 1:2020cv00827
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/17/2020 at 02:00 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 11/12/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Lone Star Resort LLC, Carol Unkle, Charles Unkle, Todd Unkle, Troy Unkle, Unkle Family Trust (Ryan, Michael) Modified text on 10/19/2020 (jem).
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand (reliance) by Lone Star Resort LLC, Carol Unkle, Charles Unkle, Todd Unkle, Troy Unkle, Unkle Family Trust (Ryan, Michael) Modified text on 10/19/2020 (jem).
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071; District Judge Paul L. Maloney is no longer assigned to the case (jem)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to file answer extended to 10/17/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint by defendants Lone Star Resort LLC, Carol Unkle, Charles Unkle, Todd Unkle, Troy Unkle, Unkle Family Trust (Ryan, Michael)
September 22, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael T. Ryan on behalf of defendants Lone Star Resort LLC, Carol Unkle, Charles Unkle, Todd Unkle, Troy Unkle, Unkle Family Trust (Ryan, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Charles Unkle served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020 (Wasserman, Cristine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Todd Unkle served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020 (Wasserman, Cristine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Troy Unkle served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020 (Wasserman, Cristine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Unkle Family Trust served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020 (Wasserman, Cristine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Lone Star Resort LLC served on 9/5/2020 (Wasserman, Cristine)
September 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael T. Ryan on behalf of defendants Lone Star Resort LLC, Carol Unkle, Charles Unkle (Ryan, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REISSUED as to All Defendants to correct defendant name (slk) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (slk).
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Lone Star Resort LLC, Carol Unkle, Charles Unkle, Todd Unkle, Troy Unkle, Unkle Family Trust (slk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Wasserman, Cristine)
August 28, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cristine M. Wasserman on behalf of plaintiffs Maria Angerer, Andreas Funkl, Gerd Funkl (Wasserman, Cristine)
August 28, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Andreas Funkl in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5626925 (Yeotis, Dean)
August 28, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Lone Star Resort LLC, Carol Unkle, Charles Unkle, Todd Unkle, Troy Unkle, Unkle Family Trust none provided (ndj)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ndj)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Gerd Funkl, Maria Angerer, Andreas Funkl (Yeotis, Dean) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funkl et al v. Lone Star Resort LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkle Family Trust
Represented By: Michael T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Unkle
Represented By: Michael T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Resort LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Unkle
Represented By: Michael T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Unkle
Represented By: Michael T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Unkle
Represented By: Michael T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreas Funkl
Represented By: Dean T. Yeotis
Represented By: Cristine M. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerd Funkl
Represented By: Dean T. Yeotis
Represented By: Cristine M. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Angerer
Represented By: Dean T. Yeotis
Represented By: Cristine M. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?