Mott #193734 v. Rewerts
Plaintiff: Carl Mott #193734
Defendant: Randee Rewerts
Case Number: 1:2020cv00835
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #9 , Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #10 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Carl Mott #193734 (ns)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying certificate of appealability and denying #2 and #3 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO #7 filed by plaintiff Carl Mott #193734 (ns)
September 16, 2020 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number GR071936 (tlbu)
September 14, 2020 Copy of Opinion (Screening) #6 , Order Setting Misc. Deadline - Prisoner #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Carl Mott (slk)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting miscellaneous deadline: petitioner to show cause within 28 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 3, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Carl Mott #193734 (ns)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 9/30/2020 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Carl Mott #193734 re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 , MOTION to stay proceedings #3 , APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 (ns)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to stay proceedings by plaintiff Carl Mott #193734; (ns)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Carl Mott #193734 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mott #193734 v. Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randee Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Mott #193734
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?