Kim v. Ionia, City of et al
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER GwanJun Kim
Defendant: Jennifer Skorka, Ionia, City of, Thomas Troy, David K. Otis, Jason Eppler and Brandon Anderson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00843
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion to Set Aside Default, Order on Motion for Default Judgment, #40 sent via U.S. Mail to GwanJun Kim (jmw)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #30 motion to set aside default; granting #34 motion to set aside default; dismissing as moot #38 motion for default judgment; defaults entered on 10/2/2020and 10/9/2020 #14 & #27 are vacated; Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 22, 2020 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff GwanJun Kim re MOTION for default judgment as to defendants and in opposition to defendants' motion to set aside default #38 (pjw)
October 22, 2020 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to set aside default #27 (Motion to Set Aside Default and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment) #34 , MOTION to set aside default #14 , #27 (Motion to Set Aside Default and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment) #30 (as taken from #38 ) filed by GwanJun Kim (pjw)
October 22, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for default judgment as to defendants and in opposition to defendants' motion to set aside default by plaintiff GwanJun Kim; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Affidavit in Support of Motion) (pjw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant David K. Otis re MOTION to set aside default #27 (Motion to Set Aside Default and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment) #34 , Brief in Support of a Motion #35 , Attorney Appearance, Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count #36 (Ashcraft, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #35 filed by David K. Otis (Ashcraft, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 35 BRIEF in support of MOTION to set aside default #27 (Motion to Set Aside Default and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment) #34 filed by David K. Otis (Ashcraft, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to set aside default #27 (Motion to Set Aside Default and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment) by defendant David K. Otis; (Ashcraft, Michael)
October 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael Patrick Ashcraft on behalf of defendant David K. Otis (Ashcraft, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Brandon Anderson, Jason Eppler, Ionia, City of, Jennifer Skorka, Thomas Troy re Attorney Appearance, Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count #32 , Brief in Support of a Motion,, #31 , MOTION to set aside default #14 , #27 (Motion to Set Aside Default and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment) #30 (Bogren, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion,, #31 filed by Brandon Anderson, Jason Eppler, Ionia, City of, Jennifer Skorka, Thomas Troy (Bogren, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 31 BRIEF in support of MOTION to set aside default #14 , #27 (Motion to Set Aside Default and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment) #30 filed by Brandon Anderson, Jason Eppler, Ionia, City of, Jennifer Skorka, Thomas Troy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N) (Bogren, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to set aside default #14 , #27 (Motion to Set Aside Default and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment) by defendants Brandon Anderson, Jason Eppler, Ionia, City of, Jennifer Skorka, Thomas Troy; (Bogren, Michael)
October 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael S. Bogren on behalf of defendants Brandon Anderson, Jason Eppler, Ionia, City of, Jennifer Skorka, Thomas Troy (Bogren, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff GwanJun Kim re Notice (Other) #28 (pjw)
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE (titled Rule 55(b)(2) Notice of the application at least 7 days before hearing against defendant by plaintiff GwanJun Kim (pjw)
October 9, 2020 Copy of Default (Entry of) #27 sent via U.S. Mail to GwanJun Kim (jmw)
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 (VACATED) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Brandon Anderson, Ionia, City of, David K. Otis, Jennifer Skorka and Thomas Troy (pjw) Modified text on 10/28/2020; vacated per Order #40 (pjw).
October 6, 2020 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff GwanJun Kim re Affidavit in Support #22 , APPLICATION for entry of default as to David K. Otis #17 (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff GwanJun Kim re Affidavit in Support #24 , APPLICATION for entry of default as to Brandon Anderson #15 , Affidavit in Support #21 , Affidavit in Support #20 , Affidavit in Support #23 , APPLICATION for entry of default as to Troy Thomas #19 , APPLICATION for entry of default as to City of Ionia #16 , APPLICATION for entry of default as to Jennifer Skorka #18 (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default #19 filed by GwanJun Kim (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default #18 filed by GwanJun Kim (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default #17 filed by GwanJun Kim (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default #16 filed by GwanJun Kim (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default #15 filed by GwanJun Kim (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Troy Thomas (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Jennifer Skorka (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for entry of default as to David K. Otis (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION for entry of default as to City of Ionia (pjw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Brandon Anderson (pjw)
October 2, 2020 Copy of Default (Entry of) #14 sent via U.S. Mail to GwanJun Kim (tlbu)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 (VACATED) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Jason Eppler (pjw) Modified text on 10/28/2020; vacated per Order #40 (pjw).
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff GwanJun Kim re Affidavit in Support #12 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 , APPLICATION for entry of default as to Jason Eppler #11 (pjw)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default #11 filed by GwanJun Kim (pjw)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Jason Eppler (pjw)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GwanJun Kim (pjw)
September 28, 2020 SUMMONS returned executed; Brandon Anderson served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020; Jennifer Skorka served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020; Thomas Troy served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020 (as taken from attachment to 9 ]) (pjw); Modified text on 10/9/2020 (pjw).
September 28, 2020 SUMMONS returned executed; Ionia, City of served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020 (as taken from attachment to #9 ]) (pjw) Modified text on 9/29/2020 (pjw).
September 28, 2020 SUMMONS returned executed; Jason Eppler served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020 (as taken from attachment to #9 ) (pjw) Modified text on 9/29/2020 (pjw).
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; David K. Otis served on 9/13/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Copy of Service Green Cards) (pjw)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from GwanJun Kim requesting summonses be issued and returned to him (pjw)
September 9, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Brandon Anderson, Jason Eppler, Ionia, City of, David K. Otis, Jennifer Skorka, Thomas Troy and forwarded to Grand Rapids Clerk's Office for plaintiff to pick up (jlg) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (jlg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE , consent, and reference of a civil action to a magistrate judge, originally filed in the Eastern District of Michigan per letter #6 by plaintiff GwanJun Kim (jlg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff re summons and notice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (jlg)
September 3, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to GwanJun Kim (jmw)
September 2, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Brandon Anderson, Jason Eppler, Ionia, City of, David K. Otis, Jennifer Skorka, Thomas Troy (none provided) (pjw)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-12264; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/1/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by GwanJun Kim against All Defendants Receipt No: FEE PAID - Fee: $ 400. (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Ionia, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER GwanJun Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Skorka
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ionia, City of
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Troy
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K. Otis
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Eppler
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Anderson
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?