Rodriguez v. Hirshberg Acceptance Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Rodriguez
Defendant: Modern Financial Services Corp. and Hirshberg Acceptance Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00877
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #23 filed by Kathryn Rodriguez (Warner, Curtis)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Rule 12(B)(6) #18 filed by Kathryn Rodriguez (Warner, Curtis)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #8 request for pre-motion conference; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jlg)
October 7, 2020 Filing 21 WITHDRAWAL by plaintiff Kathryn Rodriguez of MOTION for order for a prompt Rule 16 Conferance #14 filed by Kathryn Rodriguez (Warner, Curtis)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #19 filed by Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp. (Klaus, Kathleen)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Rule 12(B)(6) #18 filed by Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp. (Klaus, Kathleen)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Rule 12(B)(6) by defendants Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp.; (Klaus, Kathleen)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE cancelling pre-motion conference set for 10/26/20 (aks)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 (DISREGARD) NOTICE cancelling hearing (Seymore, Anna) Modified text on 10/6/2020; disregarded under the directive of chambers (mg).
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order for a prompt Rule 16 Conferance #14 filed by Kathryn Rodriguez (Warner, Curtis)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for order for a prompt Rule 16 Conferance by plaintiff Kathryn Rodriguez; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B.) (Warner, Curtis)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; Judge Janet T. Neff is no longer assigned to the case (asm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT (video conference instructions as to 10/26/2020 pre-motion conference) by the Court [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp., Kathryn Rodriguez only] (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document number #8 : pre-motion conference via video conference is set for 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Janet T. Neff; counsel shall not appear in person; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp. #8 ; filed by Kathryn Rodriguez filed by Kathryn Rodriguez (Warner, Curtis)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp. (Klaus, Kathleen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Defendants' Motion for Additional Time to Respond to the Complaint by defendants Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp.; (Klaus, Kathleen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Modern Financial Services Corp. (Klaus, Kathleen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hirshberg Acceptance Corp. (Klaus, Kathleen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ndj)
September 10, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Curtis Charles Warner on behalf of plaintiff Kathryn Rodriguez (Warner, Curtis)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-240 (jmw)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Ionia County Circuit Court by defendants Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp. (Klaus, Kathleen)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ionia County Circuit Court case number 20-K-34471-CZ filed by Modern Financial Services Corp., Hirshberg Acceptance Corp. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summonses, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint) (Klaus, Kathleen)
September 9, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Hirshberg Acceptance Corp., Modern Financial Services Corp. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5669115 (Klaus, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Hirshberg Acceptance Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Rodriguez
Represented By: Curtis Charles Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Financial Services Corp.
Represented By: Kathleen H. Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirshberg Acceptance Corp.
Represented By: Kathleen H. Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?