Calkins-Darling v. Lansing, City of et al
Plaintiff: Avery C. Thompson Smith and Mary Jean Calkins-Darling
Defendant: Caitlin Budzinski, Eric A. Schertzing, Ingham, County of, Lansing, City of, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Amy L. Castillo and Ingham County Board of Commissioners
Case Number: 1:2020cv00901
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 EXHIBIT re #12 by plaintiff Mary Jean Calkins-Darling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21, #11 Exhibit 22, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 24, #14 Exhibit 25, #15 Exhibit 26, #16 Exhibit 27, #17 Exhibit 28, #18 Exhibit 29, #19 Exhibit 30, #20 Exhibit 31, #21 Exhibit 32, #22 Exhibit 33, #23 Exhibit 34, #24 Exhibit 35, #25 Exhibit 36, #26 Exhibit 37, #27 Exhibit 38, #28 Exhibit 39, #29 Exhibit 40, #30 Exhibit 41, #31 Exhibit 42, #32 Exhibit 43, #33 Exhibit 44, #34 Exhibit 45, #35 Exhibit 46, #36 Exhibit 47, #37 Exhibit 48, #38 Exhibit 49, #39 Exhibit 50, #40 Exhibit 51, #41 Exhibit 52, #42 Exhibit 53, #43 Exhibit 54, #44 Exhibit 55, #45 Exhibit 56, #46 Exhibit 57) (eod)
October 29, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caitlin Budzinski, Amy L. Castillo, Ingham County Board of Commissioners, Ingham, County of, Lansing, City of, Eric A. Schertzing and delivered to US Marshal for service (eod)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 28, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Mary Jean Calkins-Darling (ems)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis with her given name on or before 10/30/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 9, 2020 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Mary Jean Calkins-Darling (ems)
October 9, 2020 Copy of Order #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Mary Jean Calkins-Darling (ems)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Caitlin Budzinski, Amy L. Castillo, Ingham County Board of Commissioners, Ingham, County of, Lansing, City of, Eric A. Schertzing, Unknown Part(y)(ies) filed by Mary Jean Calkins-Darling (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (ems)
September 24, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to File and Receive Notice Electronically #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Avery C. Thompson Smith (ems)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 motion for leave to file and receive notice electronically ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Avery C. Thompson Smith (ems)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically by plaintiff Avery C. Thompson Smith; (ems)
September 17, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #7 , Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Order, #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Avery C. Thompson Smith (ems)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 motion for TRO; denying #4 motion to proceed under a pseudonym; if plaintiff wishes to proceed with litigation, he or she shall file an Amended Complaint in his or her given name not later than 9/30/20; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to proceed using pseudonym and protective order #4 filed by Avery C. Thompson Smith (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for order to proceed using pseudonym and protective order by plaintiff Avery C. Thompson Smith; (ems)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Avery C. Thompson Smith; (ems)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Caitlin Budzinski, Amy L. Castillo, Ingham County Board of Commissioners, Ingham, County of, Lansing, City of, Eric A. Schertzing, Unknown Part(y)(ies) filed by Avery C. Thompson Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 30, #8 Exhibit 31, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 42, #11 Exhibit 57) (ems)
September 16, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Avery C. Thompson Smith (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calkins-Darling v. Lansing, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlin Budzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A. Schertzing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingham, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy L. Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingham County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery C. Thompson Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jean Calkins-Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?