Warszawski v. Home Depot, The
Plaintiff: Nancy Warszawski
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc. and Home Depot, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv00936
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Nancy Warszawski for Rule 26(a) disclosures (Thompson, George)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 4/30/2021; dispositive motions due by 6/1/2021; settlement conference set for 10/12/2021 at 01:00 PM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 11/2/2021 at 10:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; jury trial set for 11/30/2021 at 09:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; case management order to issue (Proceedings Not Digitally Recorded) (sjc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 11/2/2020 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Neff; telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 11/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERENCE pursuant to consent of parties to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge; case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Jereck, Carolyn)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Nancy Warszawski of State Court Complaint upon defendant Home Depot, The on 9/24/20 (Thompson, George) Modified text on 10/14/2020 (ems).
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 (DISREGARD) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Nancy Warszawski served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020 (Thompson, George) Modified text per filing attorney on 10/13/2020; filed in error (ems).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/2/2020 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 10/26/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Home Depot, The (Jereck, Carolyn)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot, The identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Corporate Parent Home Depot International, Inc., Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc., The for Home Depot, The (Jereck, Carolyn) Modified text on 9/25/2020 (ems).
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
September 24, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Home Depot, The in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5728081 (Jereck, Carolyn) Modified text on 9/25/2020 (ems).
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grand Traverse County Circuit Court, case number 20-35456-NO, filed by Home Depot, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Request to Admit, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Removal - Circuit Court, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proof of Service) (Jereck, Carolyn) Modified text on 9/25/2020 (krv) Modified text on 9/25/2020 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warszawski v. Home Depot, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Warszawski
Represented By: George R. Thompson
Represented By: Daniel P. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn M. Jereck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot, The
Represented By: Carolyn M. Jereck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?