Johnson et al v. Benson
Plaintiff: Marian Sheridan, Ruth Johnson and Terri Lynn Land
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Petitioner: Mr. Jim Pedersen, Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Mr. Charles Robinson, Mr. Gerard McMurran and Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans
Case Number: 1:2020cv00948
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 21, 2020 Filing 42 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendant Jocelyn Benson (Grill, Erik)
October 20, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEF by defendant Jocelyn Benson Defendant Secretary of State Jocelyn Benson's Court Order Statement (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A. SOS statement re local clerk guidance) (Meingast, Heather)
October 19, 2020 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENT re Response in Opposition,, #24 by defendant Jocelyn Benson (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 7. Republican National Committee order, #3 Exhibit 8. Robert Davis order) (Meingast, Heather)
October 19, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General containing Part 9 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 80. Order Granting Summary Disposition) (Meingast, Heather)
October 19, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTES of motion hearing re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Terri Lynn Land, Ruth Johnson, Marian Sheridan held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER; #4 is held in abeyance; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 18, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE respecting the Michigan Court of Appeals Decision in Michigan Alliance by plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan (Dawson, Todd) Modified text on 10/19/2020 (pjw).
October 16, 2020 Filing 35 SUPPLEMENT re Response in Opposition,, #24 by defendant Jocelyn Benson (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 6. MI Alliance v Benson MICOA Opinion) (Meingast, Heather)
October 15, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Reply to Response to Motion #33 filed by Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan (Dawson, Todd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to response to motion #4 filed by Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan (Dawson, Todd)
October 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Courtney Elgart on behalf of movants Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Elgart, Courtney)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 motion for leave to file oversized reply brief; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 14, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file excess pages in Reply Brief in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #29 filed by Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan (Dawson, Todd)
October 14, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to file excess pages in Reply Brief in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan; (Dawson, Todd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, #26 filed by Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
October 13, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION re #26 of Uzoma N. Nkwonta in Support of the Alliance's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by movants Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16) (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
October 13, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction #4 filed by Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition,, #24 filed by Jocelyn Benson (Grill, Erik)
October 13, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction #4 filed by Jocelyn Benson (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1. MI Alliance, et al v Benson, et al, COA 354993, Legislature Appeal, #3 Exhibit 2. MI Alliance, et al v Benson, et al, COA 354993, Order, #4 Exhibit 3. RNC/MRP v SOS, et al, Court of Claims, 20-000191-MZ, Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4. Davis v Benson, Court of Claims 20-000196-MZ, Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5. Guidance documents) (Grill, Erik)
October 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Danielle Serbin on behalf of movants Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Serbin, Danielle)
October 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Reina Almon-Griffin on behalf of movants Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Almon-Griffin, Reina)
October 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jyoti Jasrasaria on behalf of movants Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Jasrasaria, Jyoti)
October 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily Brailey on behalf of movants Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Brailey, Emily)
October 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta on behalf of movants Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
October 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Marc Elias on behalf of movants Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Elias, Marc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General Part 6 containing 79 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 79. Order setting stay mtn briefing schedule) (Meingast, Heather)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General Part 6 containing 78 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 58. Appendics, #2 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 59. Appendices, #3 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 18. Plfs Affidavit & Exhibits, #4 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 38. Plfs Supp Brf, #5 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 43 & 44 Plfs Aff & Exhibits, #6 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 43 & 44 Plfs Aff & Exhibits, #7 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 43 & 44 Plfs Aff & Exhibits) (Meingast, Heather)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General Michigan Court of Appeals containing 27 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 1. MICOA Register of Actions, #2 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 2. Appendix, #3 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 3. Bundle Cover Sheet, #4 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 4. Emergency Application for Leave to Appeal, #5 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 5. Jurisdictional Checklist, #6 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 6. Jurisdictional Checklist1, #7 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 7. Motion for Immediate Consideration, #8 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 8. Court of Claims Order re intervention, #9 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 9. MICOA ltr re defect to WIlder, #10 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 10. Notification to Meingast, #11 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 11. Notification to Prescott, #12 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 12. Notification to Seyferth, #13 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 13. Notification to Wilder, #14 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 14. Notification to MSC Bundle Cover Sheet, #15 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 15. Notification to MSC, #16 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 16. Pls' Opposition to Emergency Application bundle cover sheet, #17 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 17. Pls' Opposition to Emergency Application, #18 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 18. Notification of Appeal MSC, #19 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 19. Reply Brief Bundle Cover Sheet, #20 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 20. Reply Brief, #21 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 21. Order denying application notification court of claims, #22 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 22. Order denying application notification Meingast, #23 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 23. Order denying application notification Prescott, #24 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 24. Order denying application notification Seyferth, #25 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 25. Order denying application notification Stephens, #26 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 26. Order denying application notification Wilder, #27 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 27. Order denying application) (Meingast, Heather)
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General Part 5 containing 78 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 60. Pls' Mtn Summary Disposition, #2 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 61. Anderson Mtn Withdraw, #3 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 62. RNC Amicus Curiae, #4 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 63. RNC Amicus Curiae, #5 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 64. Defs' Supp Brief, #6 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 65. Opinion & Order granting preliminary injunction, #7 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 66. Legislature Emergency Renewed Mtn Intervene, #8 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 67. Legislature Mtn Immediate Consideration, #9 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 68. Order re briefing schedule, #10 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 69. MSC Order setting dates, #11 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 70. Pls' Response State Defs' MSD, #12 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 71. Defs' Response Pls' MSD, #13 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 72. Defs' Resp to Leg Mtn Intervention, #14 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 73. Pls' Response Leg Mtn Intervention, #15 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 74. MICOA Order dismissing appeal, #16 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 75. Pls' Supp Authority, #17 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 76. Opinion & Order granting intervention & mtns for SD, #18 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 77. Legislature's Emerg Mtn to Stay Injunction Pending Appeal, #19 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 78. Legislature's Mtn for Immediate Consideration) (Meingast, Heather)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General Part 4 containing 78 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 39. Order denying recon, #2 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 40. Pls' Supp Authority, #3 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 41. Order re briefing schedule, #4 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 42. MICOA Pls' Opp to Emerg Application, #5 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 45. Verified Amended Complaint, #6 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 46. Pls' Renewed Mtn Preliminary Injunction, #7 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 47. Notification of Emerg Bypass Application, #8 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 48. Pls' Supp Brief, #9 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 49. MICOA order denying application, #10 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 50. Order re hearing date, #11 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 51. Stipulated Order extending time, #12 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 52. Order extending time, #13 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 53. Defs' Mtn Summary Disposition, #14 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 54. Pls' Witness List, #15 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 55. Defs' Response to Pls' Supp Brief, #16 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 56. Legislature Supp Brief, #17 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 57. Pls' Amended Witness List) (Meingast, Heather)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General Part 3 containing 78 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 19. Pls' Brief Support Mtn Prelim Injunction, #2 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 20. Legislature Mtn Immediate Consideration, #3 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 21. Pls' Mtn for Temporary Admission, #4 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 22. State Bar Notification Almon-Griffin, #5 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 23. Order, #6 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 24. Order, #7 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 25. Defs' Response, #8 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 26. Pls' Response, #9 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 27. Leg Brief as Amicus Curiae, #10 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 28. RNC Mtn Immediate Consideration, #11 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 29. RNC Mtn Intervene, #12 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 30. Opinion & Order re mtn intervene, #13 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 31. Defs' Response, #14 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 32. Leg Brief as Amicus Curiae, #15 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 33. Leg Mtn Reconsideration, #16 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 34. Opinion & Order re mtn intervene, #17 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 35. Order re briefing schedule, #18 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 36. Defs' Supp Brief, #19 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 37. Leg Supp Brief) (Meingast, Heather)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General Part 2 containing 78 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 11. State Bar Notification Elias, #2 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 12. State Bar Notification Nkwonta, #3 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 13. Order re temporary admission, #4 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 14. Order re status conference, #5 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 15. Order re briefing schedule & hearing, #6 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 16. Leg Mtn Intervene, #7 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 17. Order re briefing schedule & hearing) (Meingast, Heather)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General Part 1 containing 78 volumes of transcript (Attachments: #1 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 1. Court of Claims Register of Acts, #2 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 2. Plaintiffs' Summons & Complaint, #3 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 3. State Defendants' Appearance Meingast & Grill, #4 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 4. Acknowledgement of Service for Benson, #5 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 5. Order consolidating, #6 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 6. Amended Order consolidating, #7 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 7. Plaintiffs' Motion for Admission, #8 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 8. State Bar Notification Elgart, #9 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 9. State Bar Notification Anderson, #10 Additional Rule 5 Trial Court Documents 10. State Bar Notification Jasrasaria) (Meingast, Heather)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 motion to amend schedule; Intervening Defendants will file a response by 10/13/2020 at 5pm; Plaintiffs to file reply by 10/15/2020 at 10am; Motion Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 9 a.m. in Kalamazoo; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (ns)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 motion to intervene; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to expedite and amend scheduling order by plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Compliance) (Dawson, Todd)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan re Order #6 (Dawson, Todd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION to intervene (expedited hearing requested) intervenor parties Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Charles Robinson, Gerard McMurran, Jim Pedersen #9 , CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for UNOPPOSED MOTION to intervene (expedited hearing requested) intervenor parties Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Charles Robinson, Gerard McMurran, Jim Pedersen #9 filed by Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Gerard McMurran, Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Jim Pedersen, Charles Robinson (Prescott, Sarah)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION to intervene (expedited hearing requested) intervenor parties Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Charles Robinson, Gerard McMurran, Jim Pedersen by intervenor parties Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans, Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute, Charles Robinson, Gerard McMurran, Jim Pedersen ; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, Proposed Answer) (Prescott, Sarah)
October 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Richard Bryan Raile on behalf of plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan (Raile, Richard)
October 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David B. Rivkin on behalf of plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan (Rivkin, David)
October 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew Michael Grossman on behalf of plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan (Grossman, Andrew)
October 1, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Erik Alexander Grill on behalf of defendant Jocelyn Benson (Grill, Erik)
October 1, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Heather S. Meingast on behalf of defendant Jocelyn Benson (Meingast, Heather)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Jocelyn Benson served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Dawson, Todd)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER scheduling hearings on motions; Motion Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2020 at 174 Federal Building, 410 W. Michigan Ave., Kalamazoo, Michigan; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER establishing briefing schedule; service due by 10/5/2020 at noon; Response to Motion for PI due by 10/13/2020 at 5pm; Reply due by 10/16/2020 at 10 am; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 filed by Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan (Attachments: #1 Dawson Declaration, #2 Dawson Decl., Ex. A, #3 Dawson Decl., Ex. B, #4 Dawson Decl., Ex. C, #5 Johnson Declaration, #6 Land Declaration, #7 Sheridan Declaration, #8 Proposed Order) (Dawson, Todd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan; (Dawson, Todd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Jocelyn Benson (pjw)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
September 29, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Ruth Johnson, Terri Lynn Land, Marian Sheridan in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5743286 (Dawson, Todd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jocelyn Benson filed by Ruth Johnson, Marian Sheridan, Terri Lynn Land (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Court of Claims Order, #2 Summons) (Dawson, Todd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jocelyn Benson filed by Ruth Johnson, Marian Sheridan, Terri Lynn Land (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - Court of Claims Order, # 2 Summons) (Dawson, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Represented By: Erik Alexander Grill
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Sheridan
Represented By: Todd A. Dawson
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: David B. Rivkin
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Johnson
Represented By: Todd A. Dawson
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: David B. Rivkin
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lynn Land
Represented By: Todd A. Dawson
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: David B. Rivkin
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Jim Pedersen
Represented By: Sarah S. Prescott
Represented By: Danielle Serbin
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Courtney Elgart
Represented By: Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Detroit/Downriver Chapter of the A. Philip Randolph Institute
Represented By: Sarah S. Prescott
Represented By: Danielle Serbin
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Courtney Elgart
Represented By: Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Charles Robinson
Represented By: Sarah S. Prescott
Represented By: Danielle Serbin
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Courtney Elgart
Represented By: Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Gerard McMurran
Represented By: Sarah S. Prescott
Represented By: Danielle Serbin
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Courtney Elgart
Represented By: Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michigan Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Sarah S. Prescott
Represented By: Danielle Serbin
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Courtney Elgart
Represented By: Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?