Blocker v. Michigan, State of et al
Plaintiff: Corey Blocker
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer, Michigan, State of and Bank of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00988
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (tlbu)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is related to 1:20-cv-444 and 1:20-cv-772 (pjw)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for order to issue subpoena by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (pjw)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for order to issue subpoena by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (pjw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Corey Blocker (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw) Modified text on 10/23/2020 (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blocker v. Michigan, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?