Taylor v. Ingham County 30th Judicial Circuit Court
Plaintiff: Karen Taylor
Defendant: Ingham County 30th Judicial Circuit Court
Case Number: 1:2020cv01043
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/27/2021 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 1/20/2021 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Ingham County 30th Judicial Circuit Court (Toskey, Bonnie)
November 30, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bonnie G. Toskey on behalf of defendant Ingham County 30th Judicial Circuit Court (Toskey, Bonnie)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Ingham County 30th Judicial Circuit Court served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 (Laurila, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Ingham County 30th Judicial Circuit Court (pjw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (pjw)
October 30, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Karen Taylor in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5874956 (Laurila, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Laurila, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Karen Taylor (Laurila, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Ingham County 30th Judicial Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingham County 30th Judicial Circuit Court
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Taylor
Represented By: Andrew J. Laurila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?