Blocker v. Michigan, State of et al
Plaintiff: Corey Blocker
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer, Michigan, State of and Bank of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01058
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to serve the complaint named as motion to subpoena by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (ndj)
December 28, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to amend/correct #1 and add party by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (ndj)
December 17, 2020 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #25 along with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (eod)
December 16, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for new trial by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (eod)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REJECTING Statement of Fact submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
December 14, 2020 Copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #23 , Certified Copy of Judgment #24 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (eod)
December 11, 2020 Filing 24 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #12 , #13 , #20 , #11 , #18 , #9 , #21 , #14 , #19 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for order to subpoena by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (eod)
December 7, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for default judgment as to by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (eod)
December 4, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for order (named as Motion to Demand) by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (eod)
December 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for order to subpoena Corry Trout by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (pjw)
December 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for order to re-subpoena documents by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (pjw)
December 1, 2020 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled Statement of Fact) by plaintiff Corey Blocker (pjw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled Statement of Fact) by plaintiff Corey Blocker (pjw)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled Statement of Fact) by plaintiff Corey Blocker (pjw)
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appeal and request for sanctions on each company by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Appeal) (pjw)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for sanctions against Bank of America by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (pjw)
November 18, 2020 Copy of Report and Recommendation #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (eod)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled Statement of Fact) by plaintiff Corey Blocker (pjw)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint to add parties by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (pjw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled Statement of Case) by plaintiff Corey Blocker (pjw)
November 13, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (tlbu)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled Statement of Fact) by plaintiff Corey Blocker (pjw)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
November 10, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (pjw)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for order for subpoena by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (pjw)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case not related; random assignment done (pjw)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Corey Blocker (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blocker v. Michigan, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?