Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. et al v Benson et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Seely, Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Cameron Tarsa, Philip O'Halloran, Eric Ostergren, Alexandra Seely, Mercedes Wirsing and Marian Sheridan
Defendant: Wayne, County of, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Jocelyn Benson and Wayne County Board of County Canvassers
Case Number: 1:2020cv01083
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #34 motion to strike; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE to attorney Mark Hearne regarding recent filing #38 (pjw)
November 25, 2020 RESPONSE TO MOTION to strike #33 #34 (as taken from #38 ) filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Philip O'Halloran, Eric Ostergren, Alexandra Seely, Matthew Seely, Marian Sheridan, Cameron Tarsa, Mercedes Wirsing (pjw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE to MOTION to strike #34 re #33 by plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Philip O'Halloran, Eric Ostergren, Alexandra Seely, Matthew Seely, Marian Sheridan, Cameron Tarsa, Mercedes Wirsing (Hearne, Mark) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (pjw).
November 19, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #35 filed by City of Detroit (Fink, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to strike #33 #34 filed by City of Detroit (Fink, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 35 BRIEF in support of MOTION to strike #33 #34 filed by City of Detroit (Fink, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to strike #33 by intervenor-defendant City of Detroit; (Fink, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Philip O'Halloran, Eric Ostergren, Alexandra Seely, Matthew Seely, Marian Sheridan, Cameron Tarsa, Mercedes Wirsing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hearne, Mark)
November 18, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS ISSUED as to intervenor parties Wendell Anthony, The Michigan State Conference NAACP, intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, City of Detroit, Michigan Democratic Party (pjw)
November 18, 2020 Filing 31 CONCURRENCE re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #21 by intervenor-defendant City of Detroit (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Fink, David) Modified text on 11/18/2020 (pjw).
November 18, 2020 Filing 30 CONCURRENCE re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #21 by defendants Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers (Meingast, Heather) Modified text on 11/18/2020 (pjw)
November 18, 2020 Filing 29 CONCURRENCE re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by intervenors The Michigan State Conference NAACP, Andre Wilkes, Yvonne White and Wendell Anthony re #21 (Driker, Eugene) Modified text, filers and document link on 11/18/2020 (pjw)
November 18, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sheila Christine Cummings on behalf of intervenor-defendant Michigan Democratic Party (Cummings, Sheila)
November 18, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Julie M. Houk on behalf of intervenor parties Wendell Anthony, The Michigan State Conference NAACP, Yvonne White, Andre Wilkes (Houk, Julie)
November 17, 2020 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Wendell Anthony served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; The Michigan State Conference NAACP served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Yvonne White served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Andre Wilkes served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Hearne, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Michigan Democratic Party served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Hearne, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENT TO ACKNOWLEDGMENTS OF SERVICE #24 and #25 on behalf of Jocelyn Benson served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Michigan Board of State Canvassers served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Hearne, Mark) Modified text on 11/18/2020 (pjw).
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Jocelyn Benson served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020 (Hearne, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Michigan Board of State Canvassers served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020 (Hearne, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Canvassers served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020 (Hearne, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Hearne, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to dismiss by intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party; (ns)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting motions to intervene #6 , #10 and #14 ; Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon Defendants not later than 5:00 p.m. on 11/17/20; briefing schedule issued; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel M. Share on behalf of intervenor The Michigan State Conference NAACP (Share, Daniel)
November 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Janet L. Anderson-Davis on behalf of defendants Wayne County Board of County Canvassers, Wayne, County of (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
November 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Heather S. Meingast on behalf of defendants Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers (Meingast, Heather)
November 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Walsh on behalf of intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Walsh, John)
November 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Matthew Boynton on behalf of intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Boynton, Brian)
November 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Erik Alexander Grill on behalf of defendants Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers (Grill, Erik)
November 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Seth P. Waxman on behalf of intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Waxman, Seth)
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO MOTION to intervene intervenor The Michigan State Conference NAACP #6 , MOTION to intervene intervenor-defendant City of Detroit #14 , MOTION to intervene with request for expedited consideration intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party #10 filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Philip O'Halloran, Eric Ostergren, Alexandra Seely, Matthew Seely, Marian Sheridan, Cameron Tarsa, Mercedes Wirsing (Hearne, Mark)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER; Responses, if any, to the City of Detroit's Motion to Intervene #14 shall be filed not later than 5:00 PM on 11/16/20; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #15 filed by City of Detroit (Fink, David)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to intervene #14 filed by City of Detroit (Fink, David) Modified text on 11/17/2020 (pjw).
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION to intervene #14 filed by City of Detroit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Fink, David) Modified text on 11/17/2020 (pjw).
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to intervene by intervenor-defendant City of Detroit (Fink, David) Modified text on 11/17/2020 (pjw).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER; Responses, if any, to the motions to intervene #6 and #10 shall be filed not later than 5:00 PM on 11/16/20; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Mikhail Infante on behalf of intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Infante, Joseph)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David H. Fink on behalf of intervenor-defendant City of Detroit ; party City of Detroit added (Fink, David)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Darryl G. Bressack on behalf of intervenor-defendant City of Detroit (Bressack, Darryl)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jyoti Jasrasaria on behalf of intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Jasrasaria, Jyoti)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Marc Elias on behalf of intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Elias, Marc)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Robert Eldridge on behalf of intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Eldridge, Scott)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan Joshua Fink on behalf of intervenor-defendant City of Detroit (Fink, Nathan)
November 14, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to intervene with request for expedited consideration intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party #10 filed by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Eldridge, Scott)
November 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to intervene with request for expedited consideration intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party #10 filed by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party (Eldridge, Scott)
November 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to intervene with request for expedited consideration intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party by intervenor-defendants Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Request for Pre-Motion Conference, #2 Exhibit 2. Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3. Proposed Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4. Affidavit of David Jaffe, #5 Exhibit 5. Affidavit of Donna MacKenzie, #6 Exhibit 6. Affidavit of Joseph Zimmerman, #7 Exhibit 7. Court of Claims Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8. Court of Claims Opinion and Order, #9 Exhibit 9. Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Consideration in Michigan Court of Appeals, #10 Exhibit 10. Polasek-Savage v. Benson Orde, #11 Exhibit 11. Stoddard v. City of Detroit Election Commission Order, #12 Exhibit 12. Constantino v. City of Detroit Order Granting Intervention, #13 Exhibit 13. Constantino v. City of Detroit Opinion and Order, #14 Exhibit 14. 2016 Trump Objections to Recount, #15 Exhibit 15. Bognet v. Secretary of Commonwealth of PA, #16 Exhibit 16. Krause v. Cegavske Order) (Eldridge, Scott)
November 14, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #6 by intervenor The Michigan State Conference NAACP (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re #6 Certificate re Concurrence Efforts by intervenor The Michigan State Conference NAACP (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Intervene #6 filed by The Michigan State Conference NAACP (Attachments: #1 Attachment Andre Wilkes Declaration, #2 Attachment Wendell Anthony Declaration, #3 Attachment Yvonne White Declaration) (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to intervene intervenor The Michigan State Conference NAACP by intervenor The Michigan State Conference NAACP; (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Wayne County Board of County Canvassers, Wayne, County of (pjw)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eugene Driker on behalf of intervenor Yvonne White ; party Yvonne White added (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eugene Driker on behalf of intervenor Wendell Anthony ; party Wendell Anthony added (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eugene Driker on behalf of intervenor The Michigan State Conference NAACP ; party The Michigan State Conference NAACP added (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eugene Driker on behalf of intervenor Andre Wilkes ; party Andre Wilkes added (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jon Greenbaum on behalf of intervenor parties Wendell Anthony, The Michigan State Conference NAACP, Yvonne White, Andre Wilkes (Greenbaum, Jon)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen E. Glazek on behalf of intervenor The Michigan State Conference NAACP (Glazek, Stephen)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen E. Glazek on behalf of intervenor Yvonne White (Glazek, Stephen)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen E. Glazek on behalf of intervenor Andre Wilkes (Glazek, Stephen)
November 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen E. Glazek on behalf of intervenor Wendell Anthony (Glazek, Stephen)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Janet T. Neff (krv)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case is not related to 1:20-cv-522 (tlbu)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Hearne, Mark)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Emergency and Permanent Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Marian Sheridan, Alexandra Seely, Mercedes Wirsing, Matthew Seely, Cameron Tarsa, Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Philip O'Halloran, Eric Ostergren (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Hearne, Mark) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (pjw).
November 11, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Philip O'Halloran, Eric Ostergren, Alexandra Seely, Matthew Seely, Marian Sheridan, Cameron Tarsa, Mercedes Wirsing in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5916962 (Hearne, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. et al v Benson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Seely
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Tarsa
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip O'Halloran
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ostergren
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Seely
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Wirsing
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Sheridan
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Board of State Canvassers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Board of County Canvassers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?