Herrera v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Lewis Herrera
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01090
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/28/2021 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 1/21/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (O'Donnell, Mary) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (ns).
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER striking answer #5 ; Defendant shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (O'Donnell, Mary)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (O'Donnell, Mary) Modified text on 12/16/2020 per Order #7 (ns).
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; National Railroad Passenger Corporation served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020 (Zogheib, David)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (ns)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand Lewis Herrera against National Railroad Passenger Corporation filed by Lewis Herrera (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued) (Zogheib, David) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (ns).
November 12, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Lewis Herrera in the amount of $400, receipt number BMIWDC-5922712 (Zogheib, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Mary C. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Herrera
Represented By: David F Zogheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?