Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 99.44.181.150
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 99.44.181.150
Case Number: 1:2020cv01106
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to serve third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to file and serve a third-party subpoena by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Patrick Paige, #3 Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #4 Declaration of David Williamson, #5 Proposed Order) (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 12/4/2020 (ems).
November 18, 2020 Copy of complaint #1 , Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
November 18, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 99.44.181.150 (proposed summons not provided) (ems)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
November 17, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5942414 (Bernier, Joel)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 11/18/2020 (ems).
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 99.44.181.150 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 11/18/2020 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 99.44.181.150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 99.44.181.150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel Alexander Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?