Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership et al v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. and Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership
Defendant: Daniel Eichinger and Gretchen Whitmer
Case Number: 1:2020cv01141
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT by the Court (Instructions for 2/17/21 pre-motion conference video hearing) [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Daniel Eichinger, Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Gretchen Whitmer only] (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document number #10 : pre-motion conference is set for 2/17/2021 at 01:30 PM by video before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Daniel Eichinger, Gretchen Whitmer #10 ; filed by Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. filed by Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. (Ellsworth, Peter)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 unopposed motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Daniel Eichinger, Gretchen Whitmer (Reichel, Robert)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply by defendants Daniel Eichinger, Gretchen Whitmer; (Reichel, Robert)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. as to Gretchen Whitmer waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 2/1/2021 (Ellsworth, Peter)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. as to Daniel Eichinger waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 2/1/2021 (Ellsworth, Peter)
December 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Paul Bock on behalf of defendants Daniel Eichinger, Gretchen Whitmer (Bock, Daniel)
December 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert P. Reichel on behalf of defendants Daniel Eichinger, Gretchen Whitmer (Reichel, Robert)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Daniel Eichinger, Gretchen Whitmer (ems)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge Inc. for Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (ems).
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Management, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge Inc. for Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (ems).
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership identifying Corporate Parent Enbridge Pipelines (Lakehead) L.L.C., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Management, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge Inc. for Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (ems).
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Daniel Eichinger, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notification of Revocation and Termination of Easement, #2 Summons - Gretchen Whitmer, #3 Summons - Daniel Eichinger) (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (ems).
November 24, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5973967 [Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy Company, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership(pty:pla)] (DeRosier, Phillip)
November 24, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Hyler Coburn on behalf of plaintiffs Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Coburn, David)
November 24, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William T. Hassler on behalf of plaintiffs Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Hassler, William)
November 24, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua H. Runyan on behalf of plaintiffs Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Runyan, Joshua)
November 24, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alice Loughran on behalf of plaintiffs Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Loughran, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership et al v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Eichinger
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Represented By: Robert P. Reichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Represented By: Robert P. Reichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enbridge Energy Company, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?