Michigan, State of et al v. Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, The State of Michigan and Michigan, State of
Defendant: Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership and Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P.
Amicus Curiae: Dave Yost, Bay Mills Indian Community, Keith Ellison, Great Lakes Business Network, Great Lakes Environmental Organizations, Government of Canada, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Canadian Chamber of Commerce, Michigan Chamber of Commerce, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Inc, North American's Building Trades Unions and United Steelworkers
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2020cv01142
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Michigan, State of (Reichel, Robert)
November 16, 2021 Filing 82 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by amicus Government of Canada re #73 (as filed per Order #80 ) (ems) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (ems).
November 16, 2021 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership re #41 (as filed per Order #80 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ems) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (ems).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER granting #73 motion for leave to file supplemental brief; granting #76 motion for leave to file supplemental brief; denying #41 motion to remand; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 79 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Amicus Brief #76 filed by Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Michigan, State of (Reichel, Robert)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: Plaintiffs' response to motion #76 due not later than the close of business on 11/12/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 8, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE to attorney Simon A. Steel regarding recent filing #76 (ems)
November 5, 2021 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Amicus Brief by amicus Government of Canada; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Document, #2 Certificate of Motion Concurrence) (Steel, Simon) Modified text on 11/8/2021 (ems).
November 4, 2021 Filing 75 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Brief on Canada's Invocation of 1977 Transit Treaty #73 filed by Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Michigan, State of (Reichel, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Brief on Canada's Invocation of 1977 Transit Treaty #73 filed by Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
October 21, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Brief on Canada's Invocation of 1977 Transit Treaty by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Supplemental Brief, #2 Exhibit B - Statement by Minister Garneau) (Ellsworth, Peter)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER striking letters #69 , #70 , and #71 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 71 (STRICKEN) LETTER from attorney Peter H. Ellsworth for defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership regarding Response to 10/6/21 Letter From Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WSJ Editorial) (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text per Order #72 on 10/13/2021 (ems).
October 6, 2021 Filing 70 (STRICKEN) LETTER from attorney Robert P. Reichel for plaintiff Michigan, State of regarding Response to correspondence submitted by counsel for amicus curiae, the Government of Canada (Reichel, Robert) Modified text per Order #72 on 10/13/2021 (ems).
October 4, 2021 Filing 69 (STRICKEN) LETTER from attorney Gordon Davies Giffin for amicus Government of Canada regarding Invocation of Article IX of the 1977 Treaty (Giffin, Gordon) Modified text per Order #72 on 10/13/2021 (ems).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying #55 motion for leave to file; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER dismissing as moot #62 motion to enforce notice of appointment of facilitative mediator; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 66 RESPONSE TO MOTION to enforce Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator #62 filed by Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
September 15, 2021 Filing 65 RESPONSE TO facilitative mediation report dated September 14, 2021 filed by defendants Daniel Eichinger, Gretchen Whitmer (Reichel, Robert) Modified text per Chambers on 9/15/2021 (ems).
September 14, 2021 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to enforce Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator #62 filed by Michigan, State of (Reichel, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 63 BRIEF in support of MOTION to enforce Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator #62 filed by Michigan, State of (Reichel, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION to enforce Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator by plaintiff Michigan, State of; (Reichel, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 61 JOINT NOTICE and Status Report of the Parties by plaintiff Michigan, State of (Reichel, Robert) Modified text on 9/14/2021 (ems).
August 18, 2021 Filing 60 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
August 13, 2021 Filing 59 LETTER from attorney Margrethe K. Kearney for amicus parties Great Lakes Business Network, Great Lakes Environmental Organizations regarding Portland Pipeline Brief (Kearney, Margrethe)
July 16, 2021 Filing 58 RESPONSE TO MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand #55 filed by Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Michigan, State of (Reichel, Robert)
July 8, 2021 Filing 57 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
July 2, 2021 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand #55 filed by Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
July 2, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand) (Ellsworth, Peter)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER; Joint Notice re mediation due within 7 days; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 30, 2021 Filing 53 JOINT NOTICE AND STATUS REPORT OF THE PARTIES by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 7/1/2021 (eod)
June 21, 2021 Filing 52 LETTER from attorney Gordon Davies Giffin for amicus Government of Canada regarding status of discussions between the Parties to the 1977 Treaty (Giffin, Gordon)
June 2, 2021 Filing 51 REPLY to response to motion #41 to Remand filed by Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources (Reichel, Robert)
June 1, 2021 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Inc (Brader, Valerie)
June 1, 2021 Filing 49 BRIEF by amicus parties Canadian Chamber of Commerce, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Michigan Chamber of Commerce, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Inc in Opposition to Motion to Remand #41 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - PSC Report, #3 Exhibit B - Intek, #4 Exhibit C - Response Plan, #5 Exhibit D - MI Assessment, #6 Exhibit E - UP Presentation, #7 Exhibit F - Wisc Order 268, #8 Exhibit G - Alternative Analysis, #9 Exhibit H - GAO Report, #10 Exhibit I - Wisc Order 197, #11 Exhibit J - IRS Notice, #12 Exhibit K - Mich Order 2016-10, #13 Exhibit L - Emergency Ext (June), #14 Exhibit M - Emergency Ext (July), #15 Exhibit N - Tenn Order 56, #16 Exhibit O - NASEO report, #17 Exhibit P - Interim Report, #18 Exhibit Q - Third Agreement, #19 Exhibit R - Tunnel Agreement) (Brader, Valerie) Modified text on 6/2/2021 (eod)
June 1, 2021 Filing 48 BRIEF by amicus North American's Building Trades Unions re #41 in Support of Enbridge's Opposition to Motion to Remand (Canzano, John)
June 1, 2021 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO MOTION to remand #41 filed by Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Stafford) (Ellsworth, Peter)
June 1, 2021 Filing 46 BRIEF by amicus Bay Mills Indian Community re #41 In Support of Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Clark, Christopher)
June 1, 2021 Filing 45 BRIEF by amicus Government of Canada re #41 in Support of Defendants (Giffin, Gordon)
June 1, 2021 Filing 44 BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #41 filed by Great Lakes Business Network, Great Lakes Environmental Organizations (Kearney, Margrethe)
June 1, 2021 Filing 43 BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #41 filed by State Amicus Curiae Keith Ellison (Currie, Leigh) Modified text on 6/2/2021 (eod)
June 1, 2021 Filing 42 BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #41 filed by Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources (Reichel, Robert)
June 1, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to remand by plaintiffs Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources; (Reichel, Robert)
June 1, 2021 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources for Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand (Reichel, Robert)
June 1, 2021 Filing 39 BRIEF by amicus Dave Yost on behalf of State of Ohio and State of Louisiana Regarding Economic Harm Resulting From a Line 5 Shutdown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Harper, Matthew) Modified text on 6/2/2021 (eod)
May 19, 2021 Filing 38 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
May 12, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John G. Adam on behalf of amicus United Steelworkers ; party United Steelworkers added (Adam, John)
May 11, 2021 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE by amicus North American's Building Trades Unions for Amicus Brief (Canzano, John)
May 11, 2021 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE by amicus parties Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Canadian Chamber of Commerce, Michigan Chamber of Commerce, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Inc for Amici Curiae Brief in support of Defendants (opposing motion to remand) [Attorney Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader added to party Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America(pty:am), Attorney Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader added to party Canadian Chamber of Commerce(pty:am), Attorney Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader added to party Michigan Chamber of Commerce(pty:am), Attorney Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader added to party Ohio Chamber of Commerce(pty:am), Attorney Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader added to party Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Inc(pty:am)] (Brader, Valerie)
May 11, 2021 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE by amicus Government of Canada for Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants [Attorney Gordon Davies Giffin added to party Government of Canada(pty:am)] (Giffin, Gordon)
May 11, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John R. Canzano on behalf of amicus North American's Building Trades Unions ; party North American's Building Trades Unions added (Canzano, John)
April 27, 2021 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership for Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand (Ellsworth, Peter)
April 20, 2021 Filing 33 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
April 13, 2021 ATTORNEY Leigh Currie ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (mkc)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER dismissing as moot #26 motion for leave to file; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 31 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Leigh Currie; attorney admission deadline set for 5/4/2021; (eod)
April 2, 2021 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE by amicus Keith Ellison for state Aicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs and proof of service (Attachments: #1 Letter) (eod)
March 30, 2021 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE by amicus Bay Mills Indian Community for Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand [Attorney Christopher Robert Clark added to party Bay Mills Indian Community(pty:am)] (Clark, Christopher)
March 30, 2021 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE by amicus Margrethe Kearney for Amicus Brief (Kearney, Margrethe)
March 26, 2021 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 510108762 as to plaintiffs Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Michigan, State of (mkc)
March 23, 2021 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 826627 as to defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (mkc)
March 19, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file An Amicus Curiae Brief Instanter on Behalf of The State of Ohio and The State of Louisiana Regarding Economic Harm Resulting From A Line 5 Shutdown #26 filed by Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost (Harper, Matthew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to file An Amicus Curiae Brief Instanter on Behalf of The State of Ohio and The State of Louisiana Regarding Economic Harm Resulting From A Line 5 Shutdown by amicus Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost; (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - The impact of a Line 5 shutdown, #3 Exhibit B - Enbridge's Pipelines in Michigan: Fueling Michigan's Economic Engine, #4 Exhibit C - Letter from Jeffrey Pillon, Member of Michigan Pipeline Safety Advisory Board to Michigan Governor Rick Snyder, dated August 27, 2018, #5 Exhibit D - Toledo Refining Company Presentation: "Energy drives quality of life, #6 Exhibit E - Letter from Matthew Lucey, President of PBF Energy to the Honorable Judge Jamo, Circuit Court for the 30th Judicial District, Ingham County, Michigan, dated June 29, 2020, #7 Exhibit F - BP's economic investment: Ohio, #8 Exhibit G - Enbridge's economic impact on Ohio, #9 Exhibit H - Letter from Sean McGarvey, President of North America's Building Trade Unions to Michigan Governor Whitmer and Michigan Attorney General Nessel, dated June 14, 2019, #10 Exhibit I - Letter from Ohio Governor DeWine and Ohio Lieutenant Governor Husted to Michigan Governor Whitmer, dated June 17, 2019, #11 Proposed Order) (Harper, Matthew) Modified text on 3/22/2021 (eod)
March 19, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Gerald E. Rosen ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 3/26/2021 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 3/26/2021 (lep)
March 19, 2021 Copy of Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator #25 sent via email to Hon. Gerald E. Rosen (lep)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #23 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
March 16, 2021 Filing 23 JOINT NOTICE re selection of facilitative mediator by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 3/17/2021 (eod)
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Michigan, State of for Motion to Remand (Reichel, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of Pre-Motion Conference held 02/17/2021 before Honorable Janet Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/24/2021 ; redaction request due 3/16/2021 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Brandell, Paul (517) 230-7507)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: setting forth the briefing schedule re anticipated motion to remand; joint notice due within 28 days of this Order; denying without prejudice to renew pre-motion conference request #9 ; extending deadline for filing answers/responsive pleadings; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 17, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTES of pre-motion conference re #9 , #15 held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 16, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John J. Bursch on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Bursch, John)
January 20, 2021 Filing 18 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT by the Court (Instructions for 2/17/21 pre-motion conference video hearing) [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Governor of the State of Michigan, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Michigan, State of only] (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document numbers #9 , #15 : pre-motion conference is set for 2/17/2021 at 01:30 PM by video before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 11, 2021 REFUND of filing fee paid 12/10/20 as requested in #13 in the amount of $402.00 as to Phillip J. DeRosier with Dickinson Wright PLLC sent via pay.gov (Financial Administrator, ced)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiffs Michigan, State of, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Governor of the State of Michigan #15 ; filed by Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 1/4/2021 (eod)
December 15, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiffs Michigan, State of, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Governor of the State of Michigan by plaintiffs Michigan, State of, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Governor of the State of Michigan; (Reichel, Robert)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership #9 ; filed by Michigan, State of, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Governor of the State of Michigan filed by Michigan, State of, Michigan Department of Natural Resources, Governor of the State of Michigan (Reichel, Robert)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (DeRosier, Phillip)
December 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - AMENDED - from Ingham County Circuit Court case number 20-646-CE filed by Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. (Ellsworth, Peter)
December 10, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #12 by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6046627 (DeRosier, Phillip)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 unopposed motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership; (Ellsworth, Peter)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
December 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Hyler Coburn on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Coburn, David)
December 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William T. Hassler on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Hassler, William)
December 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua H. Runyan on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Runyan, Joshua)
December 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alice Loughran on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Loughran, Alice)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (slk)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 (DISREGARD) NOTICE (slk) Modified text on 12/1/2020 - document did not attach (slk).
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Ray Kent indicating that this case is related to 1:20-cv-1141 (jmw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE for Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to state attorney general by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership re Notice of Removal #1 (DeRosier, Phillip) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (pjw).
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. (Ellsworth, Peter)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Ellsworth, Peter)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ingham County Circuit Court case number 290646-CE filed by Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Document(s) Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Ellsworth, Peter)
November 24, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5974172 [Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership(pty:dft)] (DeRosier, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michigan, State of et al v. Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy Company, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Governor of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Robert P. Reichel
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Department of Natural Resources
Represented By: Robert P. Reichel
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan, State of
Represented By: Robert P. Reichel
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dave Yost
Represented By: Matthew D. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bay Mills Indian Community
Represented By: Christopher Robert Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Keith Ellison
Represented By: Leigh Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Great Lakes Business Network
Represented By: Margrethe K. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Great Lakes Environmental Organizations
Represented By: Margrethe K. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Government of Canada
Represented By: Gordon Davies Giffin
Represented By: Simon A. Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Canadian Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michigan Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ohio Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Inc
Represented By: Valerie Jo Mac Millan Brader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North American's Building Trades Unions
Represented By: John R. Canzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United Steelworkers
Represented By: John G. Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Gerald E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?