Viking Corporation, The v. Local Union 5965 United Steel Workers AFL-CIO-CLC
Plaintiff: Viking Corporation, The
Defendant: Local Union 5965 United Steel Workers AFL-CIO-CLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01214
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Viking Corporation, The (O'Rourke, Matthew)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Viking Corporation, The as to Local Union 5965 United Steel Workers AFL-CIO-CLC waiver sent on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021 (van Stempvoort, Stephen)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Local Union 5965 United Steel Workers AFL-CIO-CLC served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021 (van Stempvoort, Stephen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Viking Corporation, The identifying Corporate Parent Viking Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Minimax Viking Group for Viking Corporation, The (van Stempvoort, Stephen)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Local Union 5965 United Steel Workers AFL-CIO-CLC (jem)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hon. Hala Y. Jarbou; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (jem)
December 17, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew M. O'Rourke on behalf of plaintiff Viking Corporation, The (O'Rourke, Matthew) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (jem).
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (van Stempvoort, Stephen)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (van Stempvoort, Stephen)
December 17, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Viking Corporation, The in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6076804 (van Stempvoort, Stephen) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (jem).
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local Union 5965 United Steel Workers AFL-CIO-CLC filed by Viking Corporation, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Shop Rules, #3 Exhibit 3 - Attendance Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 - Award) (van Stempvoort, Stephen) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (jem).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viking Corporation, The v. Local Union 5965 United Steel Workers AFL-CIO-CLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viking Corporation, The
Represented By: Stephen James van Stempvoort
Represented By: Matthew M. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Union 5965 United Steel Workers AFL-CIO-CLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?