Bailey #730664 v. Bailey et al
Plaintiff: William Joseph Bailey #730664
Defendant: Corey Burks, L. Paul Bailey, Chuck Heit, Brian Wilkey and Edward Kuhl
Case Number: 1:2021cv00076
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $6.63, receipt number GR073396; amount paid to date $6.63 (jem)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to William Joseph Bailey #730664 and Berrien County Jail Administrator (ems)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $6.63 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Financial Affidavit and County Jail Statement of Transactions and Balances submitted by plaintiff William Joseph Bailey #730664 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 2/23/2021 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Deficiency Order #3 sent via U.S. Mail to William Joseph Bailey #730664 (ems)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff William Joseph Bailey #730664 (ems)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against L. Paul Bailey, Corey Burks, Chuck Heit, Edward Kuhl, Brian Wilkey filed by William Joseph Bailey #730664 (ems) Modified text on 1/25/2021 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey #730664 v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Paul Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Heit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wilkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Joseph Bailey #730664
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?