Elliott v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ernest Elliott
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00128
Filed: February 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and returned to attorney for plaintiff (ndj) Modified text on 3/1/2021 (ndj)
February 26, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Ernest Elliott in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6343210 (Rinck, James)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filing fee to be submitted by 3/9/2021 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ndj)
February 7, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Rinck, James)
February 7, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rinck, James)
February 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Ernest Elliott (Rinck, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Elliott
Represented By: James R. Rinck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?