Bradley v. Benton Harbor Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Wade Bradley
Defendant: Unknown McGee, Michigan Department of Corrections and Benton Harbor Police Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv00176
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #17 to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 12, 2021 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Michigan Department of Corrections re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #17 , Attorney Appearance, Brief in Support of a Motion #18 , Jury Demand #16 (Marcum, Joshua)
April 12, 2021 Filing 18 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #17 filed by Michigan Department of Corrections (Marcum, Joshua)
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Michigan Department of Corrections; (Marcum, Joshua)
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by defendant Michigan Department of Corrections (Marcum, Joshua)
April 12, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua Douglas Marcum on behalf of defendant Michigan Department of Corrections (Marcum, Joshua)
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand with certificate of service by Benton Harbor Police Department, Unknown McGee (Ferrand, Timothy) Modified text on 4/12/2021 (ems).
April 9, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy Ferrand on behalf of defendants Benton Harbor Police Department, Unknown McGee (Ferrand, Timothy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Korey Roberts for Michigan Department of Corrections served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021 (ems)
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Benton Harbor Police Department served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021 (ems)
March 9, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benton Harbor Police Department, Unknown McGee, Michigan Department of Corrections and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems)
March 9, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Wade Bradley (ems)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis re #11 ; dismissing as moot #6 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ems)
February 24, 2021 Copy of Order #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Wade Bradley (ems)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 ; Plaintiff shall within seven days file an amended application; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
February 24, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Wade Bradley (ems)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 4:19-cv-12771; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ems)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Wade Bradley. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
January 22, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order to Show Cause on Wade Bradley, 1734 Broadway, Apt. 1C, Niles, MI 49120 (THal) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Wade Bradley. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
October 9, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute on Wade Bradley, 1734 Broadway, Apt. 1C, Niles, MI 49120 (THal) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 11/9/2020 Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)[Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
January 31, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order on Wade Bradley at address of record (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
January 31, 2020 Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman to District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis pursuant to Administrative Order 20-AO-010. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
September 24, 2019 Deficiency directed to Wade Bradley: Initiating document filed without any form of payment or Application for In Forma Pauperis. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wade Bradley against defendants (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Benton Harbor Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McGee
Represented By: Timothy Ferrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Represented By: Joshua Douglas Marcum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton Harbor Police Department
Represented By: Timothy Ferrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?