Knapp v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephanie Kay Knapp
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00280
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/25/2021 (ns)
April 7, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (ns)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ns)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is not related to 1:18-cv-1278 (tlbu)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Stephanie Kay Knapp (Rinck, James)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Stephanie Kay Knapp (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Rinck, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Kay Knapp
Represented By: James R. Rinck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?