Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 104.185.135.10
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 104.185.135.10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00316
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to serve a third-party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Patrick Paige, #3 Declaration of David Williamson, #4 Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer) (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (ems).
April 15, 2021 Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #4 , complaint #1 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
April 15, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 104.185.135.10 (proposed summons not submitted by filing party) (ems)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
April 13, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6407546 (Bernier, Joel)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (ems).
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 104.185.135.10 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 104.185.135.10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel Alexander Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 104.185.135.10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?