Lakel v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Lisa Lakel
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00339
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline extended to 7/12/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 until July 12, 2021 by defendant Life Insurance Company of North America; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brosky, Gilbert)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Life Insurance Company of North America served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 copy of certified mail return receipt card) (Haney, Troy)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Life Insurance Company of North America (mg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Lisa Lakel (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Haney, Troy)
April 22, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Lisa Lakel in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6416063 (Haney, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lakel v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Gilbert Patrick Brosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lakel
Represented By: Troy W. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?