The Toasted Oat, Inc. v. Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC
Plaintiff: The Toasted Oat, Inc.
Defendant: Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00374
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #9 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC (Crocker, Blake)
June 30, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC (Crocker, Blake)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC (Crocker, Blake)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that defendant Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking answer #11 ; defendant Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this order; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 7/27/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 7/22/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to Amended Complaint #9 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC (Crocker, Blake) Modified text on 6/24/2021; document stricken per Order #13 (jem).
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021 (Steckler, Bruce)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC filed by The Toasted Oat, Inc. (Steckler, Bruce)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO #7 Show Cause Order filed by plaintiff The Toasted Oat, Inc. (Steckler, Bruce)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is to show cause why the Court should not dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction or file an amended complaint by 5/14/2021; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Toasted Oat, Inc. (Lubben, Craig)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to attorney Craig H. Lubben regarding recent filing #1 (pjw)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC (pjw)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (pjw) Modified file date on 5/6/2021 (pjw).
May 6, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bruce Steckler on behalf of plaintiff The Toasted Oat, Inc. (Steckler, Bruce)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Lubben, Craig)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC filed by The Toasted Oat, Inc. (Lubben, Craig)
May 5, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff The Toasted Oat, Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6427424 (Lubben, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Toasted Oat, Inc. v. Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snackwerks of Michigan, LLC
Represented By: Blake D. Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Toasted Oat, Inc.
Represented By: Craig H. Lubben
Represented By: Bruce Steckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?