Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.49.216.129
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 68.49.216.129
Case Number: 1:2021cv00383
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to serve third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to serve third-party subpoena by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit B-Paige Declaration, #3 Exhibit C -Stalzer Declaration, #4 Exhibit A-Williamson Declaration, #5 Proposed Order) (Bernier, Joel); Modified text on 5/14/2021 (pjw).
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (pjw)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (pjw)
May 7, 2021 Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #4 and Complaint #1 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (pjw)
May 7, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.49.216.129 (none provided and party not named) (pjw) Modified text on 5/21/2021 (pjw).
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.49.216.129 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 5/7/2021 and 5/21/2021 (pjw).
May 6, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6429133 (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.49.216.129
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 68.49.216.129
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel Alexander Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?