Wizinsky et al v. Leelanau, Township of et al
Plaintiff: William G. Wizinsky and Ann M. Wizinsky
Defendant: Unknown Party #2, Karrie A. Zeits, Unknown Party #1, Leelanau, Township of, Unknown Party #5, Unknown Party #4, Steve Patmore, Leelanau, County of, Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, Paul Hunter, T. Seth Koches, The Shores Homeowners Association, Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Chet Janik, Unknown Party #3 and Stephen Holmes
Case Number: 1:2021cv00496
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to dismiss and/or for Judgment on the Pleadings by defendants Paul Hunter, Chet Janik, Leelanau, County of; (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 - 1992 Township Land Use Permit, #3 Exhibit 2 - 1992 County Permit, #4 Exhibit 3 - Enforcement Excerpt, #5 Exhibit 4 - 1-26-18 Plan Review, #6 Exhibit 5 - Mich. Res. Code R110.3, #7 Exhibit 6 - Wizinsky(1) Complaint, #8 Exhibit 7 - 10-22-19 Leelanau County Court Order, #9 Exhibit 8 - MI COA Docket Sheet, #10 Exhibit 9 - Wizinsky(2) Complaint, #11 Exhibit 10 - Wizinsky(1) Order, #12 Exhibit 11 - Wizinsky(2) 6th Cir. Rehearing Denial Order, #13 Exhibit 12 - 10-5-20 CBA Minutes, #14 Exhibit 13 - CBA Decision Letter, #15 Exhibit 14 - Demo Permit, #16 Exhibit 15 - Demo Inspection Record, #17 Exhibit 16 - 2-23-21 SCCC Minutes, #18 Exhibit 17 - 3-2-21 SCCC Decision, #19 Exhibit 18 - 12-8-20 MI COA Order, #20 Exhibit 19 - 8-3-21 MI SC Order, #21 Exhibit 20 - Jackson v. Shelby County, #22 Exhibit 21 - Hughes v. Wood, #23 Exhibit 22 - Pamela Johnson Trust v. Anderson, #24 Exhibit 23 - Chaconas v. Lima Township, #25 Exhibit 24 - County Administrator Description, #26 Exhibit 25 - Jones v. Walled Lake, #27 Exhibit 26 - Building Official Description) (Zalewski, Matthew)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time #74 filed by William G. Wizinsky (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 8/11/2021 (mlc).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #68 , #64 with brief in support and certificate of rule compliance by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky; (Wizinsky, William) Modified text and relationships on 8/11/2021 (mlc).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Charles Lamb Bogren on behalf of defendant Stephen Holmes (Bogren, Charles)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Charles Lamb Bogren on behalf of defendants Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches (Bogren, Charles)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Set Aside Settlement Agreement #72 filed by William G. Wizinsky (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 8/11/2021 (mlc).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Set Aside Settlement Agreement by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky; (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Motion (with signature), #2 Brief in Support, #3 Affidavit and Certificate of Rule Compliance , #4 List of Exhibits with Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibits 2 - 4, #6 Exhibits 5 - 9, #7 Exhibits 10 - 18, #8 Exhibits 19 - 22, #9 Exhibits 23 - 28, #10 Exhibits 28 - 29, #11 Exhibit 30 , #12 Exhibits 31 - 32, #13 Exhibits 33 - 36) (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 8/11/2021 (mlc).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches for Defendants T. Seth Koches and Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman, PC's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions; and Brief in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Attachment UPS Shipping Labels) (Bogren, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #69 filed by Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches (Bogren, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendants Koches and Bauckham, Sparks' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) #68 filed by Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bogren, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendants Koches and Bauckham, Sparks' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) by defendants Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches; (Bogren, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Stephen Holmes for Defendant Stephen Holmes' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions; and Brief in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Attachment UPS Shipping Labels) (Bogren, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #65 filed by Stephen Holmes (Bogren, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendant Stephen Holmes' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) #64 filed by Stephen Holmes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bogren, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendant Stephen Holmes' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) by defendant Stephen Holmes; (Bogren, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to response to motion #23 filed by Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Karrie A. Zeits (Anderson, David)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion, #61 filed by Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches (Bogren, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE TO MOTION for discovery #43 filed by Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bogren, Michael) Modified text and link on 8/4/2021 (ems).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion #59 filed by Stephen Holmes (Bogren, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE TO MOTION for discovery #43 filed by Stephen Holmes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bogren, Michael) Modified text and link on 8/4/2021 (ems).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to response to motion #41 , #43 with certificate of service and certificate of rule compliance filed by William G. Wizinsky (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibits 6-10) (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (ems).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE re #51 to Court by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (ems).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE TO PRO SE MOTION for discovery #43 with brief in support, certificate of compliance, and certificate of service filed by Paul Hunter, Chet Janik, Leelanau, County of (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Diplomat v. Humana, #3 Exhibit 2 - Holden v. Jensen) (Zalewski, Matthew) Modified text on 7/30/2021 (jem).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE TO PRO SE MOTION for discovery #43 with brief in support, certificate of compliance, and certificate of service filed by The Shores Homeowners Association (Conlon, Michael) Modified text on 7/30/2021 (jem).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE to attorney William G. Wizinsky regarding recent filing #51 (slk)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE to attorney Mary C. Aretha regarding recent filing #50 , #49 (slk)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE to attorney Mary C. Aretha regarding recent filing #50 , #49 (slk)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss #23 filed by William G. Wizinsky (Attachments: #1 Response continued #2 List of Exhibits, Exhibits 1-4 #3 Exhibits 5-11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibits 13-17, #6 Exhibit 18-20, #7 Exhibit 21-25, #8 Exhibits 26-27) (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/29/2021 (slk). Modified text on 8/5/2021 (ems).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE TO PRO SE MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion to dismiss #41 filed by Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Karrie A. Zeits (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss and Brief, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's First RFP, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Extension to Answer, #6 Exhibit Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion) (Aretha, Mary)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE TO PRO SE MOTION for discovery #43 filed by Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Karrie A. Zeits (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss and Brief, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's First RFP, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Extension to Answer, #6 Exhibit Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Early Discovery) (Aretha, Mary)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for Third Request for Documents from Defendant the Shores (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/28/2021 (slk).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lindsey Ann Peck on behalf of defendants Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Karrie A. Zeits (Peck, Lindsey)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order #47 sent via U.S. Mail to Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting STIPULATION for substitution of attorney #46 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for substitution of attorney by defendant Leelanau, Township of [Attorney Bradley D. Wierda added to party Leelanau, Township of(pty:dft)] (Wierda, Bradley) Modified text on 7/19/2021 (ems).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for 2nd Request for Documents for Leelanau Township and Steve Patmore (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (ems).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Regarding Motion and Certificate of Concurrence #40 sent via U.S. Mail to Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re PRO SE MOTION for discovery #43 filed by William G. Wizinsky (Wizinsky, William)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PRO SE MOTION for discovery by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibits 6-10) (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (ems).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re PRO SE MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion to dismiss #41 filed by William G. Wizinsky (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (ems).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PRO SE MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion to dismiss by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky; (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (ems).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER regarding Motion for Extension of Time to File #38 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (DISREGARD) ORDER regarding Motion for Extension of Time to File #38 and certificate of concurrence; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (jal).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion to dismiss by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky; (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Rule Compliance) (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (ems).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for Plaintiffs' First Request for Documents from Leelanau County (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (ems).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER regarding Motion for Extension of Time #29 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER regarding Motion for Discovery #28 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for Second Request for Documents from the Shores HOA (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/13/2021 (ems).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for request for documents from Defendant Leelanau Township and Defendant Steve Patmore (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/13/2021 (ems).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for request for documents from Defendant Leelanau Township and Defendant Steve Patmore (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/13/2021 (ems).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mary C. Aretha on behalf of defendants Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Karrie A. Zeits (Aretha, Mary)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Regarding Motion and Certificate of Concurrence #36 , Order Regarding Motion and Certificate of Concurrence #35 sent via U.S. Mail to Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for request for documents The Shores (Wizinsky, William)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for Request for documents Zeits and Firm (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/9/2021 (pjw).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Discovery Return Letter #26 sent via U.S. Mail to William G. Wizinsky and Ann M. Wizinsky with discovery material (eod)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for time extension for Keits and Firm's Motion to Dismiss with Brief in Support, certificates of compliance and certificate of service by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky and Ann M. Wizinsky (Wizinsky, William) Modified text and filers on 7/9/2021 (pjw).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for early discovery with Brief in Support, certificates of compliance and certificate of service by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky and Ann M. Wizinsky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 6-10) (Wizinsky, William) Modified text and filers on 7/9/2021 (pjw).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses, reliance upon jury demand and certificate of service by Paul Hunter, Chet Janik, Leelanau, County of (Zalewski, Matthew) Modified text on 7/9/2021 (pjw).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER RETURNING DISCOVERY MATERIAL: First Set of Interrogatories to Plunket Cooney and First Request for Documents to Plunket Cooney returned to plaintiff William G. Wizinsky and plaintiff Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #24 with certificate of service filed by Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Karrie A. Zeits (Anderson, David) Modified text on 7/8/2021 (ems).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #23 with certificate of service filed by Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Karrie A. Zeits (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17) (Anderson, David) Modified text on 7/8/2021 (ems).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to dismiss with certificate of service by defendants Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, Karrie A. Zeits; (Anderson, David) Modified text on 7/8/2021 (ems).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky for Rule 34 Request for Documents to Plunkett Cooney (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (ems).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time #19 sent via U.S. Mail to Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
July 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE TO MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Complaint (Expedited Consideration Requested) #10 , MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Complaint (Expedited Consideration Requested) #12 filed by William G. Wizinsky (Wizinsky, William) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (ems).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand reliance by The Shores Homeowners Association (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Conlon, Michael) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (ems).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Defendant Stephen Holmes's Request to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and #12 Defendants Koches and Bauckham, Sparks's Request to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint; responses due 8/6/2021; Defendant Unknown Party #4 is terminated as duplicative of Defendant Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC; directing Clerk to correct the name of Defendant Unknown Party #1 to Stephen Holmes; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Complaint (Expedited Consideration Requested) #12 filed by Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches, Unknown Party #4 (Bogren, Michael) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (ems).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Complaint (Expedited Consideration Requested) #10 filed by Unknown Party #1 (Bogren, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand with certificate of service by Leelanau, Township of, Steve Patmore (Koches, Theodore) Modified text on 7/1/2021 (ems).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER regarding Motion for Extension of Time #12 and certificate of concurrence; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding Motion for Extension of Time #10 and certificate of concurrence; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Regarding Motion and Certificate of Concurrence #14 , Order Regarding Motion and Certificate of Concurrence #15 sent via U.S. Mail to Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Complaint (Expedited Consideration Requested) #12 filed by Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches, Unknown Party #4 (Bogren, Michael) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (ems). Modified text on 7/6/2021 (ems).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Complaint (Expedited Consideration Requested) by defendants Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches, Unknown Party #4; (Bogren, Michael) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (ems). Modified text on 7/6/2021 (ems).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Complaint (Expedited Consideration Requested) #10 filed by Unknown Party #1 (Bogren, Michael) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (ems).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Complaint (Expedited Consideration Requested) by defendant Unknown Party #1; (Bogren, Michael) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (ems).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael S. Bogren on behalf of defendant Unknown Party #1 Stephen Holmes (Bogren, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael S. Bogren on behalf of defendants Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, T. Seth Koches, Unknown Party #4 (Bogren, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew Jason Zalewski on behalf of defendants Paul Hunter, Chet Janik, Leelanau, County of (Zalewski, Matthew)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 motion for leave to file and receive notice electronically; denying #6 motion for order for name of unknown financier(s); signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to File and Receive Notice Electronically, Order on Motion for Order #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; Paul Hunter served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021; Chet Janik served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021; T. Seth Koches served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; Leelanau, County of served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021; Leelanau, Township of served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021; Steve Patmore served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021; Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021; The Shores Homeowners Association served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021; Unknown Party #1 served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021; Unknown Party #2 served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021; Unknown Party #3 served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021; Unknown Party #4 served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; Unknown Party #5 served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021; Karrie A. Zeits served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021 (ems)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for electronic filing #4 and MOTION for name and request for documents #6 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for order for name of unknown financer(s) by plaintiffs Ann M. Wizinsky, William G. Wizinsky; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (ems)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky (ems)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically by plaintiff William G. Wizinsky; (ems)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to William G. Wizinsky, Ann M. Wizinsky (ems)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Berens indicating that this case is related to 1:19-cv-191 and 1:19-cv-894 (ems)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, Paul Hunter, Chet Janik, T. Seth Koches, Leelanau, County of, Leelanau, Township of, Steve Patmore, Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, The Shores Homeowners Association, Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3, Unknown Party #4, Unknown Party #5, Karrie A. Zeits filed by Ann M. Wizinsky, William G. Wizinsky (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Civil Cover Sheet) (ems) Modified text on 6/25/2021 (ems).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number LN002823; for filing fee (ems)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC, Paul Hunter, Chet Janik, T. Seth Koches, Leelanau, County of, Leelanau, Township of, Steve Patmore, Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC, The Shores Homeowners Association, Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3, Unknown Party #4, Unknown Party #5, Karrie A. Zeits and returned to plaintiff at counter in LN (ems) Modified text on 6/21/2021 (ems). Modified text on 6/25/2021 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wizinsky et al v. Leelanau, Township of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karrie A. Zeits
Represented By: David C. Anderson
Represented By: Lindsey Ann Peck
Represented By: Mary C. Aretha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leelanau, Township of
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Represented By: Theodore Seth Koches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #4
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Patmore
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Represented By: Theodore Seth Koches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leelanau, County of
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bauckham, Sparks, Thall, Seeber & Kaufman PC
Represented By: Charles Lamb Bogren
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hunter
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Seth Koches
Represented By: Charles Lamb Bogren
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shores Homeowners Association
Represented By: Michael I. Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sondee, Racine & Doren, PLC
Represented By: David C. Anderson
Represented By: Lindsey Ann Peck
Represented By: Mary C. Aretha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chet Janik
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Holmes
Represented By: Charles Lamb Bogren
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Wizinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann M. Wizinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?