Fleming #358778 v. Macauley
Petitioner: Michael D. Fleming #358778
Respondent: Matt Macauley
Case Number: 1:2021cv00587
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas), #12 , Order on Motion to Reopen Case #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael D. Fleming #358778 (ems)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: this order, petition and brief served electronically on Michigan Department of Corrections and Attorney General of the State of MI; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 180 days; no extensions will be granted; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (jkw)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion to Reopen Case; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for all further proceedings (mg)
August 19, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael D. Fleming #358778 (mg)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to reopen case by petitioner Michael D. Fleming #358778; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment cover letter) (mg)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by petitioner Michael D. Fleming #358778 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge not reassigned as case closed on 7/19/2021 (mlc)
July 20, 2021 Certified Copy of Order Staying Habeas Case, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael D. Fleming #358778 (ems)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing without prejudice unexhausted claims of petitioner for lack of exhaustion of state court remedies; remaining exhausted claims are stayed and the case is administratively closed until petitioner files a timely motion to amend the habeas petition to include any subsequently exhausted claims; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to petitioner regarding consent; statement regarding consent due 8/2/2021 (ems)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Michael D. Fleming #358778 re MOTION for order to hold federal habeas petition in abeyance pending exhaustion of unexhausted issues in state court #3 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 , APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 (ems)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for order to hold federal habeas petition in abeyance pending exhaustion of unexhausted issues in state court by petitioner Michael D. Fleming #358778; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (ems)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Michael D. Fleming #358778 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
July 12, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael D. Fleming #358778 (ems)
July 12, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael D. Fleming #358778 (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming #358778 v. Macauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael D. Fleming #358778
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matt Macauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?