Carpenter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Steven A. Carpenter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00604
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal on Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Commissioner of Social Security complete on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021 (slk)
July 22, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven A. Carpenter (jmw)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 21, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (pjw) Modified text on 7/21/2021 (pjw).
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
July 20, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven A. Carpenter (jmw)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Steven A. Carpenter (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2-Proposed Summons) (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?