Cassaday v. AT&T, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Kevin William Cassaday and RESTRICTED FILER Kevin William Cassaday
Defendant: AT&T, AT&T Inc. and Direct TV
Case Number: 1:2021cv00715
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Phillip J Green
2 Judge: Paul L Maloney
3 Judge: Janet T Neff
4 Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Certified Copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #13 , Judgment #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Cassaday (mg)
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (jas)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #9 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (jas)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 21-CA-074 that this case is reassigned to Judge Gordon J. Quist for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (mlc)
November 5, 2021 Copy of Administrative Order Reassigning Case #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin William Cassaday (mlc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re Amended Complaint #10 named as Complaint & Statement by plaintiff Kevin William Cassaday (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Exhibits) (slk)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc., Direct TV filed by Kevin William Cassaday (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (mg)
September 28, 2021 Copy of Report and Recommendation #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Cassaday (mg)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO Judge Green filed by plaintiff Kevin William Cassaday (slk) Modified text on 9/1/2021 (slk).
August 27, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin William Cassaday (ns)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 21-CA-053 that this case is reassigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (mlc)
August 24, 2021 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin William Cassaday (ns)
August 24, 2021 Copy of Administrative Order Reassigning Case #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin William Cassaday (mlc)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
August 20, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin William Cassaday (mg)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Kevin William Cassaday (mg)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against AT&T filed by Kevin William Cassaday (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Proposed summons) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassaday v. AT&T, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin William Cassaday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER Kevin William Cassaday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?