Calkins #411886 v. Demorest
Plaintiff: Robert Calkins and Robert Calkins #411886
Defendant: Anthony Demorest
Case Number: 1:2021cv00809
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alicia Lane on behalf of defendant Anthony Demorest for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Lane, Alicia)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent by plaintiff Robert Calkins #411886 (Filipovic, Milica)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by October 29, 2021; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Filipovic, Milica)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/12/2021 (mg)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (mg)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 (DISREGARD) NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/12/2021 (mg) Modified text on 9/20/2021 (mg).
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Robert Calkins (Filipovic, Milica)
September 17, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Robert Calkins in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6544803 (Filipovic, Milica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calkins #411886 v. Demorest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Calkins
Represented By: Milica Filipovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Calkins #411886
Represented By: Milica Filipovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Demorest
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?