Cook #290601 v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Cook #290601
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections, Heidi Washington and John Davids
Case Number: 1:2021cv00817
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings per consent #5 (mlc)
October 4, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Daniel Cook (mlc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff Daniel Cook #290601 regarding a docket sheet and clarification on court addresses (mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk Memo) (mlc) Modified text on 10/4/2021 (mlc).
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Daniel Cook #290601 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (mlc)
September 24, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Daniel Cook #290601 (jem)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $.36 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/12/2021 (ems)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Daniel Cook #290601 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Davids, Michigan Department of Corrections, Heidi Washington filed by Daniel Cook #290601 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (ems)
September 21, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Daniel Cook #290601 (ems)
September 21, 2021 MOTION to appoint counsel (as taken from Complaint #1 ) by plaintiff Daniel Cook #290601; (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook #290601 v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Cook #290601
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?