Brown #727383 v. Ionia Correctional Facility
Plaintiff: James Brown #72738 and James Brown #727383
Defendant: Ionia Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2021cv00836
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 by plaintiff James Brown #727383 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (eod)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff James Brown #727383 regarding status of case; remailed copy of Order #8 with docket sheet on 11/08/2021 (eod)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $4.22 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 29, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #8 sent via U.S. Mail to James Brown #727383 (eod)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from James Brown #727383 regarding mailing of financial documents (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (eod)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from James Brown #727383 regarding current status of prison water (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (eod)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff James Brown #727383 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (mg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT of prisoner account for plaintiff James Brown #727383 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mg)
September 29, 2021 Copy of Deficiency Order, #3 , Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #2 sent via U.S. Mail to James Brown #727383 (eod)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 10/26/2021 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 10/26/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/19/2021 (eod)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ionia Correctional Facility filed by James Brown #72738 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown #727383 v. Ionia Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown #72738
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown #727383
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ionia Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?